Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0487
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO NRCP 26, 30, AND 34Court:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:03/01/2013Public Hearing:06/06/2013 at 3:00 PM (RJC, Las Vegas)
Closed Date:08/10/2017

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/01/2013Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Amend Nevada Rules of Civil Procedure.13-06450
03/18/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Hearing to be held Thursday, June 6, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. at RJC in Las Vegas. Videoconferenced to Supreme Court in Carson City. Written comment invited. Original and 8 copies due by May 31, 2013. Comments must be submitted in hard-copy format. Comments submitted electronically will not be docketed. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk by May 31, 2013.13-08029
04/15/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Lionel Sawyer & Collins law firm.13-11111
05/08/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Morris Law Group.13-13469
05/21/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Murdock & Associates.13-14909
05/21/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Andre Lagomarsino, Esq.13-14912
05/23/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Nevada Justice Association.13-15232
05/24/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Chief Judge Jennifer Togliatti.13-15442
05/29/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from attorney George Bochanis.13-15701
05/30/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Litigation Section of the State Bar of Nevada.13-15913
05/30/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Michael Lowry, Esq.13-15967
05/31/2013Administrative CaseFiled comments from the law firm of Pisanelli Bice. (Todd L. Bice and James J. Pisanelli)13-16106
05/31/2013Administrative CaseFiled Comments law firm of Backus, Carranza & Burden.13-16144
06/06/2013Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
06/12/2013Administrative CaseFiled letter from George Bochanis clarifying remarks made at the public hearing.13-17215
12/19/2013Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Nevada Rules of Civil Procedure 30 and 34 (Exhibit A attached). Effective March 1, 2014. EN BANC13-38701
02/25/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Nevada Rule of Civil Procedure 30 (Exhibit A attached). Effective May 1, 2014. EN BANC14-06137
08/10/2017Administrative CaseCase Closed.