The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62720
Short Caption:SLADE VS. CAESARS ENTERTAINMENTClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A665676Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:03/06/2013 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/16/2014 at 3:00 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:09/16/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/04/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
03/04/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-06473
03/04/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-06478
03/05/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance as Counsel of Record on Appeal (James E. Whitmire, Esq. and Jason d. Smith, Esq. of the law firm of Santoro Whitmire appearing on behalf of Respondents).13-06716
03/06/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Nersesian & Sankiewicz. Check No. 2258.
03/06/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt13-06910
03/25/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Docketing Statement13-08775
04/03/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.13-09781
04/11/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.13-10698
04/25/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript.13-12180
07/05/2013BriefFiled Opening Brief -Appellant's Opening Brief on Appeal13-19624
07/05/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix .13-19625
07/05/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Joint Appendix.13-19628
07/29/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's answering brief due: August 12, 2013.13-22271
08/06/2013MotionFiled Stipulation Regarding Extention of Time to File Answering Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31(b)(2).13-23029
08/06/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: August 27, 2013.13-23038
08/27/2013BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.13-25431
09/27/2013MotionFiled Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to File Reply Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31(b)(2).13-28989
11/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief, provisionally received in this court on October 11, 2013.13-33979
11/13/2013BriefFiled Appellan'ts Reply Brief on Appeal.13-33983
11/13/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/30/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-17448
07/14/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, September 16, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-22725
09/02/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-28865
09/16/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP14 JH/MD/MC.
03/18/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy for Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc., et al, and Automatic Stay of Proceedings.15-08295
03/27/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Partially Strike or Alternatively Traverse or Object to Notice of Pendency of Bankruptcy for Caesars Entertainment Operating Companyu, Inc., Et Al. and Automatic Stay of Proceedings Filed March 18, 2015.15-09308
04/01/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Notice of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy for Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc., et al. and Automatic Stay of Proceedings15-09790
04/10/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. We dismiss this appeal as to Caesars Entertainment Operating Company. This appeal shall continue with regard to the remaining respondents, Caesars Entertainment Corp., and Paris Operating Co. LLC.15-10907
05/12/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Saitta/Gibbons. Pickering, J., with whom Douglas, J., agrees, dissenting. Cherry, J., dissenting. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 36. EN BANC16-14889
05/31/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.16-16980
05/31/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Robert A. Nersesian.
07/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondents' Answer due: 15 days.16-22800
08/02/2016MotionFiled Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Rehearing Pursuant to NRAP 26(b)(2) and 40(d).16-23884
08/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: August 22, 2016.16-23971
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/64281 (Letter entered in 66816 as document no. 16-24439.)
08/23/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Answering Brief to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.16-26183
10/12/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).16-31791
11/07/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-34635
11/07/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 16, 2016.16-34635