The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62734
Short Caption:BROOKS VS. LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF NEVADAClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):NONECase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/05/2013Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Mitchell L. Posin.
03/05/2013Petition/WritFiled Verified Application for a Writ of Mandate. EMERGENCY Motion under Rule 27(e).13-06681
03/06/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Petitioner to File an Appendix and Directing Answer. We direct petitioner to file and serve within five days of the date of this order an appendix, including the letter along with any other documentation that may be relevant to this court's review of this petition. Respondent: 11 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer. Petiitioner: 5 days to file any reply. All documents submitted in response to this order shall be filed and served personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court.13-06891
03/15/2013AppendixFiled Appendix. (Letter to Assemblyman Brooks)13-07867
03/15/2013MotionFiled Legislature's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer.13-07894
03/15/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent shall have until March 20, 2013, at 4 p.m. to file its answer to the petition. All other provisions in this court's March 6, 2013, order remain unchanged.13-07961
03/20/2013Petition/WritFiled Respondent Legislature's Answer.13-08414
03/20/2013AppendixFiled Respondent Legislature's Appendix.13-08415
03/28/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "Petitioner's failure to name the correct respondent...requires denial of the writ." EN BANC13-09303
04/22/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.13-11686
04/22/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.