Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62745
Short Caption:IN RE: BRYCE MONTIERTH (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/06/2014 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/06/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/06/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee due.
03/06/2013Order/IncomingFiled Order Certifying Question of Law to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada and the Honorable Bruce A. Markell, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge.13-06859
09/25/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Accepting Certified Questions and Directing Briefing. We grant the Bankruptcy Court's request and waive payment of the filing fee in this case. Thus, no filing fe is due. Appellants shall have 45 days fro the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date when the opening brief is served to file an answering brief. Appellants shall then have 20 days from the date when the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply brief. The parties's briefs shall comply with NRAP 28, 28.2, 31(c), and 32. The parties are further directed to prepare and file a joint appendix containing certified copies of any relevant portion of the record. The appendix shall be filed no later than the date when the opening brief is filed.13-28756
11/12/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.13-33819
11/12/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.13-33820
12/04/2013MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule.13-36294
12/04/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: January 13, 2013.13-36390
01/08/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Motion to Associate Counsel (Jan Timothy Chilton, Esq.).14-00675
01/10/2014MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule.14-00952
01/17/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel and Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Ms. Chilton shall therefore be allowed to appear in this matter on behalf of respondent. Nevada attorney Gregory L. Wilde of Tiffany and Bosco, P.A., shall be responsible for all matters presented by Ms. Chilton in this matter. Respondent shall have until January 21, 2014, to file and serve the answering brief. Appellants shall have 20 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve any reply.14-01714
01/21/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-02047
01/31/2014MotionFiled Motion of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Respondent Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.14-03345
02/07/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: February 18, 2014.14-04142
02/19/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.14-05352
02/19/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. We direct the clerk of this court to file the amicus brief that was provisionally received by this court on January 31, 2014. Appellants may respond to the amicus brief within 30 days from the date of this order.14-05834
02/21/2014BriefFiled Amicus Brief - Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.'s Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Respondent Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.14-05835
02/25/2014MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel Robert John Pratte, of the Law Firm of Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP.14-06204
04/28/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Attorney Robert Pratte of the law firm of Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP, shall be permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of MERS in this proceeding. Nevada attorney Kelly Dove of the law firm of Snell & Wilmer, LLP, shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Pratte in this matter.14-13705
08/04/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-25389
08/27/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Monday, October 6, 2014, at 10:30 am in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-28372
09/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-31547
09/26/2014BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities.14-32179
09/29/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Response to Supplemental Authorities.14-32313
10/06/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/30/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Questions answered in part." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 55.15-22990
08/24/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-25489
08/24/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)