Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62835
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67598, 67741, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088, 83088-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/20/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/20/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)13-08395
04/09/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcripts.13-10461
04/10/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Kerry Esparza's certificate due: May 30, 2013. Appellant shall have until June 19, 2013, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix.13-10608
04/26/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/20/11.13-12335
06/18/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time Due to Reassignment of Case to New Appellate Deputy.13-17961
06/19/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: August 19, 2013.13-18079
08/19/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.13-24379
08/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol I.13-24380
08/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol II.13-24381
08/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol III.13-24383
08/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol IV.13-24382
08/19/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Vol V.13-24384
08/19/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.13-24435
08/27/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Returning Exhibits Unfiled. The clerk of this court shall return the discs received on August 22, 2013, unfiled.13-25337
08/28/2013MotionFiled Motion for Transmission of Original Exhibits.13-25484
08/30/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to forward the CDs admitted on October 11, 2012, as State's exhibits 79 and 80.13-25743
09/09/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time - First Request.13-26479
09/10/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until October 9, 2013, to file and serve the fast track response.13-26730
10/09/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.13-30173
10/23/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.13-31954
10/23/2013Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
10/28/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: All Requested.13-32319
02/27/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP14-KP/RP/NS14-06537
03/24/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-09187
03/24/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/03/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 27, 2014.14-09187