Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62840
Short Caption:CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF GREEN BAY VS. DOE 119Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):56411
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A555265Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:03/29/2013 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/06/2015 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/06/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/21/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
03/21/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-08447
03/21/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-08453
03/22/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Barron & Pruitt, LLP. Check No. 14683.
03/29/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ava H. Shirinian13-09358
04/05/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-09978
04/05/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days.13-09987
04/05/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge.13-10068
04/15/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 8, 2013, at 9:30 a.m.13-11086
05/08/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Request for Transcripts.13-13512
05/13/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-14040
05/29/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/10/12, 10/11/12, 10/12/12, 10/15/12, 10/16/12, 10/17/12, 10/18/12, 10/19/12, 10/22/12, 10/23/12, 10/24/12, 10/25/12, 10/29/12, 10/30/12, 10/31/12, & 11/01/12. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte.13-15793
06/19/2013Transcript RequestFiled Supplemental Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/08/12, 10/09/12, 10/10/12, 10/11/12, 10/12/12, 10/15/12, 10/16/12, 10/17/12, 10/18/12, 10/19/12, 10/22/12, 10/23/12, 10/24/12, 10/25/12, 10/29/12, 10/30/12, 10/31/12, & 11/01/12. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte.13-18100
08/15/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Lisa A. Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/2/09, 10/10/12, 10/11/12, 10/12/12, 10/15/12, 10/16/12, 10/17/12, 10/18/12, 10/19/12, 10/22/12, 10/23/12, 10/24/12, 10/31/12, & 11/01/12. 2/01/10, 7/20/11 and 10/12/12 Previously filed in district court.13-24026
09/10/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 60 days to file opening brief and appendix. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file request for transcripts is denied as moot. Court Recorder Lisa A. Lizotte filed a certificate indicating that all of the requested transcript have been prepared and delivered.13-26676
10/31/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Appellant Catholic Diocese of Green Bary, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Time to Submit Opening Brief (First Request)13-32775
10/31/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix Due date: December 12, 2013.13-32777
12/12/2013MotionFiled Catholic Diocese of Green Bay's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request).13-37712
01/22/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant shall have until February 10, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.14-02117
02/11/2014BriefFiled Opening Brief Appellant's Opening Brief.14-04438
02/11/2014MotionFiled Motion for Permission to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation. (DETACHED OPENING BRIEF AND RETURNED, UNFILED, PER ORDER FILED 3/03/14).14-04442
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1.
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2.14-04544
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3.14-04545
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4.14-04546
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5.14-04548
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6.14-04549
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7.14-04550
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8.14-04551
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9.14-04552
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10.14-04555
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1214-04556
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13.14-04557
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 14.14-04558
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 15.14-04561
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11.14-04562
02/12/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 16.14-04567
02/12/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/25/12.14-04622
03/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Leave to Exceed the Type-Volume Limitation. The clerk of this court shall detach the proposed brief appellant's February 11, 2014, motion, and return the brief unfiled. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief that complies with NRAP 32(a)(7)(A)'s size limitations. Respondent shall have 30 days thereafter to file and serve his answering brief.14-06813
03/19/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief due: March 25, 2014.14-08841
03/20/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Revised Opening Brief.14-08957
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 1.14-08958
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 2.14-08959
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 3.14-08960
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 414-08961
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 5.14-08962
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 6.14-08963
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 7.14-08965
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 8.14-08966
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 9.14-08967
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 10.14-08968
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 11.14-08969
03/20/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Revised Appendix - Vol. 12.14-08970
04/15/2014MotionFiled Respondent John Doe 119's Motion to Extend Time to Submit Answering Brief.14-12183
04/16/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief Due Date: May 21, 2014.14-12296
05/21/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-16628
05/21/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.14-16630
06/18/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until June 27, 2014, to file and serve the reply brief.14-20056
06/30/2014BriefFiled Appellant Catholic Diocese of Green Bay, Inc.'s Reply Brief.14-21270
06/30/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/11/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-30063
09/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, November 4, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-31750
09/29/2014MotionFiled Appellant Catholic Diocese of Green Bay, Inc.s Motion to Continue Oral Argument (First Request).14-32266
09/29/2014MotionFiled Supplement to have Appellant's Motion to Continue Oral Argument Heard on Emergency Basis.14-32284
09/30/2014MotionFiled Respondent John Doe 119's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Continue Oral Argument.14-32370
09/30/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. This matter is currently scheduled for oral argument on Tuesday, November 4, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City. On September 29, 2014, counsel for appellant filed a motion to continue oral argument. The motion is opposed. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The oral argument presently scheduled for Tuesday, November 4, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby vacated. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter before the en banc court on the next available argument calendar.14-32538
09/30/2014MotionFiled Reply Brief in Support of Appellant's Motion to Continue Oral Argument on Emergency Basis.14-32568
10/09/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Unavailability of Counsel for oral argument.14-33583
10/15/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Matthew L. Sharp, Esq. as counsel for John Doe 119 in place and stead of J.R. Crockett, Jr., Esq.).14-34189
11/12/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorney for Appellant Catholic Diocese of Green Bay (Peter Mazzeo, Esq. of the law firm of Mazzeo Law, LLC in place and stead of Peter Mazzeo, Esq., of the law firm of Barron & Pruitt, LLP).14-37272
11/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, January 6, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-37882
12/17/2014MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel - Notice of Appearance.14-41150
12/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-42018
01/06/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Barron & Pruitt, LLP's Notice of Disassociation of Counsel.15-04998
05/28/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 29.15-16230
06/15/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing.15-18165
06/15/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Jeffrey R. Anderson
07/23/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Saitta, J., dissenting.15-22407
08/19/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-25055
08/19/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/31/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 24, 2015.15-25055
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)