Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62864
Short Caption:LV METRO POLICE DEPT. VS. BLACKJACK BONDING C/W 63541Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:62864*, 63541Related Case(s):63541
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A670077Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:12/09/2014 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/09/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/26/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
03/26/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-08898
03/26/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.13-08900
03/26/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-08902
03/26/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:13-08978
03/27/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.13-09056
03/27/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.13-09057
05/01/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.13-12754
05/08/2013MotionFiled Joint Motion for Limited Remand.13-13561
05/10/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.13-13929
06/07/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand. DIstrict Court: Amended Order due: 30 days.13-16791
07/02/2013Order/IncomingFiled District court order Amended Order Granting in Part Motion for Issuance of Writ of Mandamus. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 7/1/2013.13-19448
07/08/2013Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of Amended Order Granting in Part Motion for Issuance of Writ of Mandamus.13-19798
07/12/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Appellants)13-20547
08/23/2013MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 31(D) for Failure to File Opening Brief.13-24999
08/27/2013MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Counter Motion to Consolidate with Case No. 63541 and Enlarge Time to Accept Opening Brief.13-25422
09/04/2013MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 31(D) for Failure to File Opening Brief and Response to Countermotion to Consolidate Case No. 63541 and Enlarge Time to Accept Opening Brief.13-26104
09/10/2013MotionFiled Reply in Support of Counter Motion to Consolidate with Case No. 63541 and Enlarge Time to Accept Opening Brief.13-26671
10/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time, Denying Motion to Dismiss, and Consolidating Appeals. The motion for an extension is granted, and the motion to dismiss is denied. The clerk of this court shall file the proposed opening brief provisionally submitted to this court on September 10, 2013. We hereby consolidate these appeals and modify the briefing schedule as follows. Blackjack Bonding shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a combined answering brief addressing the opening brief in Docket No. 62864 and opening brief in addressing the issues in Docket No. 63541. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 28.1(f)(1), with Docket No. 62864 being treated as the appeal and Docket No. 63541 being treated as the cross-appeal. Nos. 62864/63541.13-31724
10/22/2013BriefFiled Opening Brief -Appellants' Opening Brief.13-31728
10/22/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appellants' Appendix Vol I.13-31729
10/22/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appellants' Appendix Vol II.13-31730
11/04/2013BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae, City of Henderson, In Support of The Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Nos. 62864/6354113-33025
11/04/2013AppendixFiled Appendix Amicus Curiae Appendix Vol. 1.13-33026
11/08/2013MotionFiled Motion for an Extension of Time to File Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 62864/6354113-33572
11/08/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Combined Answering and Opening Brief Due December 23, 2013. Nos. 62864/6354113-33574
12/24/2013BriefFiled Respondent-Appellee/Cross-Appellant's Combined Answering and Opening Brief. Nos. 62864/6354113-39101
12/24/2013AppendixFiled Respondent-Appellee/Cross-Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. Nos. 62864/6354113-39102
12/24/2013AppendixFiled Respondent-Appellee/Cross-Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2. Nos. 62864/6354113-39103
12/31/2013MotionFiled Motion to file Amicus Curiae Brief by the American Civi Liberties Union of Nevada Foundation, in support of Respondent-Appellee/Cross-Appellant, Blackjack Bonding, Inc.13-39621
01/23/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants/cross-respondents Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Douglas C. Gillespie: Combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: January 30, 2014. Nos. 62864/6354114-02273
01/23/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and Directing Blackkack Bonding, Inc., to File Transcript Request Form. We direct the clerk of this court to file the amicus brief that was provisionally received in this court on December 31, 2013. Blackjack Bonding, Inc., shall therefore have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve its transcript request form or a certificate that no transcript is to be requested (in Docket No. 63541). Nos. 62864/63541.14-02380
01/23/2014BriefFiled Amicus Brief Brief - The American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada (ACLU-NV), In Support of Respondent-Appellee/Cross-Appellant Blackjack Bonding, Inc. Nos. 62864/63541.14-02389
01/28/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that no Transcript is Being Requested.14-02891
01/31/2014BriefFiled Appellants'/Cross-Appellees' Combined Reply and Answering Brief.14-03269
02/05/2014MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Strike, or Alternatively, for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Respond to New Issues Raised in Appellants' Reply Brief.14-03817
02/14/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply brief on cross-appeal due: February 24, 2014. Nos. 62864/6354114-04922
02/18/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Emergency Motion to Strike Under N.R.A.P. 27(e) or Alternatively, for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Nos. 62864/63541.14-05178
02/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Strike Reply brief and Granting Leave to File Sur-Reply. Blackjack Bonding: Sur-Reply due: 11 days. Nos. 62864/6354114-05757
02/24/2014BriefFiled Respondent-Appellee/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 62864/6354114-05940
03/04/2014BriefFiled Respondent-Appellee/Cross-Appellant's Sur-Reply Brief. Nos. 62864/63541.14-06994
03/04/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/21/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 62864/63541.14-27579
10/07/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes. Nos. 62864/63541.14-33354
11/25/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-38918
12/09/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP14-KP/RP/NS.
02/03/2015BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities.15-03648
03/05/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Parraguirre/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Parraguirre/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 10. Nos. 62864/63541 NNP14-RP/NS/KP15-06884
03/18/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Craig R. Anderson, Esq. and Micah S. Echols, Esq. of Marquis Aurbach Coffing appearing as counsel for respondents Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Douglas C. Gillespie.15-08241
03/18/2015MotionFiled Respondent-Appellee/Cross-Appellant's Bill of Costs. Nos. 62864/63541.15-08300
03/20/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for Rehearing due: March 30, 2015. Nos. 62864/63541.15-08491
03/23/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Amy M. Rose as counsel for Amicus Curiae ACLU of Nevada). Nos. 62864/63541.15-08843
03/30/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Douglas C. Gillespie's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 62864/63541.15-09594
03/30/2015Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality. Nos. 62864/63541.
04/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's (Blackjack Bonding, Inc.) Answer due: 15 days. Nos. 62864/63541.15-09798
04/15/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: April 23, 2015. Nos. 62864/63541.15-11293
04/23/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent-Appellee/Cross-Appellants' Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 62864/63541.15-12345
04/27/2015MotionFiled Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Douglas C. Gillespie's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 62864/63541.15-12776
04/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply submitted on April 28, 2015. Nos. 62864/63541.15-12840
04/28/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing - Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Douglas C. Gillespie's Reply in Support of Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 62864/63541.15-12846
05/29/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 62864/63541.15-16396
06/08/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Las Vegas Police Department and Douglas C. Gillespie's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 62864/63541.15-17366
06/08/2015Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived
07/06/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC Nos. 62864/63541.15-20312
07/31/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 62864/63541.15-23161
07/31/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/20/2015RemittiturIssued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $22.26.15-25198
08/20/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 4, 2015.15-23161