Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62965
Short Caption:STEVENSON (JOSEPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60862
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C260250
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C262671
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C258757
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/09/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/09/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)13-10397
04/09/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.13-10399
04/09/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. (Second NOA).13-10400
04/09/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. (Third NOA).13-10401
04/10/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/7/12; 5/21/12; 5/30/12; 6/20/12; 7/2/12; 9/19/12; 10/10/12; 11/7/12; 11/28/12; 1/30/13; 2/13/13; and 2/20/13. Court Reporter: Jessica Kirkpatrick. Filed in district court on: April 5, 2013.13-10619
05/02/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Kirkpatrick stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/7/12; 5/21/12; 5/30/12; 6/20/12; 7/2/12; 9/19/12; 10/10/12; 11/7/12; 11/28/12; 1/30/13; 2/13/13; and 2/20/13.13-12941
05/15/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. (Fast Track Statement-60 days).13-14451
05/17/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 19, 2013.13-14603
08/14/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 15 days or fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days.13-23894
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. I.13-25610
08/29/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. II.13-25611
08/29/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant's Fast Track Statement.13-25612
09/18/2013MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Fast Track Response.13-27814
09/23/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Fast Track Response due: October 18, 2013.13-28257
10/16/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.13-31104
10/31/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.13-32697
10/31/2013Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
03/11/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief.14-07776
04/16/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time.14-12334
04/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received via E-Flex on April 16, 2014. Answering Brief due: 30 days.14-13242
04/24/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-13245
05/27/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-17142
06/26/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Rely Brief.14-20974
06/26/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: July 03, 2014.14-21027
07/07/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-21864
07/07/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/13/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Saitta/Gibbons. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 61. NNP15-NS/MG/KP15-24413
09/08/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-27078
09/08/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/17/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 14, 2015.15-27078