Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63046
Short Caption:DESAI (DIPAK) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60038, 61230, 61359, 62641, 62877, 64591, 64609
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C265107Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Gibbons for Chief Justice HardestyPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/22/2013Filing FeeFiling fee waived: criminal.
04/22/2013MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) To Stay Proceedings in District Court for Trial Commencing April 22, 2013.13-11671
04/22/2013Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus to Compel Competency Determination or, Alternatively, an Evidentiary Hearing on the Existence of Doubt as to Competency.13-11677
04/22/2013MotionFiled Motion for Leave to Seek to File Sealed Document.13-11688
04/22/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ -Petitioner's Appendix.13-11691
04/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner may submit the IME report referenced in the motion under seal. Fn1[Given the pending emergency motion for a stay, petitioner may file the sealed document by facsimile transmission in compliance with NRAP 25(a)(4).]13-11721
04/22/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ (via fax) - Petitioner's Appendix, Exhibit 3- Independent Medical Evaluation, 4/14/13 (SEALED).
04/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest, on behalf of the respondents, shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 24, 2013, to file and serve a response to the motion for a stay and an answer. Petitioner shall have until noon on Friday, April 26, 2013, to file and serve a reply. All documents in this matter shall be filed personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.13-11797
04/24/2013Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-12077
04/24/2013AppendixFiled Appendix -Respondent's Appendix.13-12079
04/26/2013Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to State's Answer.13-12271
04/29/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." Fn5[We deny the motion for a stay as moot.] Cherry, J., dissenting in part. NNP13-MG/RP/MC13-12482
05/24/2013RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.13-15405
05/24/2013Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.