The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0488
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENT TO NRCP 58(E) NOTICE OF ENTRY IN FAMILY LAW CASESClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:04/24/2013Public Hearing:05/08/2014 at 1:30 PM (Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City)
Closed Date:07/31/2014

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/24/2013Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Amend Nevada Rule of Civil Procedure 58(e) to Allow, but not Require, District Courts to Give Notice of Entry of Judgment in Family Law Cases.13-12035
03/03/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing. Thursday, May 8, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom, Carson City. Videoconferenced to the RJC in Las Vegas. Written comments invited. Original and 8 copies due by 5:00 p.m., May 2, 2014. (Exhibit A attached)14-06806
05/08/2014Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. Before the En Banc Court.
07/31/2014Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Nevada Rule of Civil Procedure 58(e) (Exhibit A attached). Effective 60 days from the date of this order.14-24982
07/31/2014Administrative CaseCase Closed.