Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63076
Short Caption:MITCHELL, D.O. VS. DIST. CT. (BUNTING)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):57965
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A594903, A610616Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/15/2014 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/15/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/25/2013Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Sarah Marie Ellerton.
04/25/2013Petition/WritFiled Renewed Petition for Writ of Mandamus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Exhibits.13-12107
04/25/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.13-12108
04/25/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.13-12109
04/25/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.13-12111
04/25/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.13-12112
04/25/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.13-12113
04/25/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.13-12114
05/03/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy Re: Renewed Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Daniel Simon, Esq..13-13081
05/03/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy Re: Renewed Petition for Writ of Mandamus by The Honorable Kenneth Cory.13-13082
05/03/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy Re: Renewed Petition for Writ of Mandamus by John Savage, Esq.13-13083
05/09/2013MotionFiled Petitioner Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the Eighth Judicial District Court, Pending the Outcome of Petitioner's Renewed Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-13709
05/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy of Petitioner Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the Eighth Judicial District Court by Brian Boschee, Esq.13-13815
05/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy of Petitioner Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the Eighth Judicial District Court by Daniel Simon, Esq.13-13816
05/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy of Petitioner Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the Eighth Judicial District Court by Gary Sinkeldam, Esq.13-13817
05/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy of Petitioner Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the Eighth Judicial District Court by The Honorable Kenneth Cory13-13818
05/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy of Petitioner Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the Eighth Judicial District Court by John Cotton, Esq.13-13819
05/31/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition.13-16071
06/03/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of District Court Order Granting Defendant Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Motion for Stay on Order Shortening Time.13-16159
06/03/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Notice of District Court Order Granting Defendant Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Motion for Stay on Order Shortening.13-16180
06/10/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Transferring Documents from Docket No. 57965, Directing Answer, and Denying as Moot Motion for Stay. The clerk of this court is directed to transfer the following documents from Docket No. 57965 and file under Docket No. 63076: the March 17, 2011, petition and appendices; the June 3, 2011, answer and appendix; and the July 8, 2011, reply to the answer. Real parties in interest: 15 days to file and serve an answer addressing any newly raised issues and requests for relief contained in petitioner's renewed petition. Petitioner: 11 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. In light of the district court's May 28 order, petitioner's stay motion is denied as moot. Real parties in interest's motion for leave to extend the time to oppose the stay is nonetheless granted, and the clerk of this court is directed to file the opposition, which was provisionally received in this court on May 31, 2013, as well as petitioner's reply to the opposition, which was provisionally received on June 3, 2013. As the stay motion is now moot, however, we conclude that no action need be taken on these filings.13-16873
06/10/2013MotionFiled Opposition to Defendant Mitchell, D.o.?s Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the Eighth Judicial District Court, Pending the Outcome of Petitioner?s Renewed Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-16876
06/10/2013MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Petitioner Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the Eighth Judicial District Court, Pending the Outcome of Petitioner's Renewed Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-16877
06/10/2013Petition/WritFiled Petiton for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively, Writ of Prohibition; and, Emergency Request for Stay of Order Denying Motion for Protective Order and Granting Motion to Compel Discovery of Defendant Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Medical and Counseling Records Pending Resolution by this Court. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 57965 PER ORDER OF 6/10/13).13-16874
06/10/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Vols. 2 thru 5. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 57965 PER ORDER OF 6/10/13).13-16878
06/10/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Vols. 6 thru 8. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 57965 PER ORDER OF 6/10/13).13-16879
06/10/2013Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus for Respondents Alec Bunting an Stella Ravella, Real Parties in Interest. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 57965 PER ORDER OF 6/10/13).13-16880
06/10/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 57965 PER ORDER OF 6/10/13).13-16881
06/10/2013Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus for Respondents Alec Bunting and Stella Ravella, Real Parties in Interest. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 57965 PER ORDER OF 6/10/13).13-16882
06/18/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition.13-17868
06/21/2013MotionFiled Petitioner Ryan Mitchell, D.O.'s Opposition to Real Parties in Interest's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition.13-18368
07/12/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Real parties in interest shall have until July 22, 2013, to file and serve their answer to the petition. Petitioner shall have 11 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.13-20486
07/22/2013Petition/WritFiled Answer to Renewed Petition for Writ of Mandamus for Respondents, Alec Bunting and Stella Ravella, Real Parties in Interest.13-21459
07/22/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Respondents Appendix13-21460
07/30/2013Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Renewed Petition for Writ of Mandamus for Respondents, Alec Bunting and Stella Ravella, Real Parties In Interest.13-22430
12/04/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Schedule Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar13-36398
12/09/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Wednesday, January 15, 2014, @ 1:30 p.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes.13-36997
12/30/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.13-39522
01/15/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP14 - KP/RP/NS.
04/30/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted in part and denied in part." We therefore issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to rescind its order rejecting the claims of privilege in this case. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry/Gibbons. Douglas, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. Saitta, J., dissenting. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 21. EN BANC15-13100
04/30/2015WritFiled Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Sarah Marie Ellerton for service upon Judge Kenneth C. Cory.15-13127
05/08/2015WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Kenneth C. Cory on May 4, 2015.15-14234
05/19/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing of En Banc Decision.15-15277
05/19/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Daniel S. Simon.
05/19/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.15-15298
05/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days.15-15894
06/10/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioner's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: June 17, 2015.15-17693
06/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Attorney (Robert C. McBride, Esq., and Chelsea R. Hueth, Esq., of the law firm of Carroll, Kelly, Trotter, Franzen, McKenna & Peabody in place and stead of Mandelbaum, Ellerton & Associates.)15-18522
06/17/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Response to Petition for Rehearing of En Banc Decision.15-18553
06/17/2015MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing.15-18589
06/19/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Real parties in interest have filed a motion for leave to file a reply in support of their petition for rehearing. A reply is not necessary for this court's review of the petition and the motion is therefore denied.15-18806
07/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. (Letter dated July 21, 2015) Nos. 63284/61059/64623/59638/60527/63076/63683/62792. (Letter entered in 63284 as document no. 15-22234)
07/23/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Douglas, J., with whom Saitta, J., joins, dissenting.15-22401
08/19/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing.15-25045
08/19/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.