The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63078
Short Caption:SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1 VS. US BANK, N.A.Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):71414
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A673671Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:05/07/2014 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/07/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/25/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
04/25/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-12154
04/25/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-12162
05/06/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from SFR Investments Pool 1, LLP. Check No. 2049.
05/07/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement due: 20 days.13-13414
05/08/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:13-13443
05/15/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel ( Ariel E. Stern and Natalie L. Winslow, of the law firm of Akerman Senterfitt LLP appearing on behalf of Respondent, US Bank, N.A.).13-14307
05/17/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.13-14630
05/23/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-15237
05/23/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service. (Certificate of No Transcript Request and Docketing Statement)13-15244
05/24/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. (Exhibits)13-15512
08/30/2013MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix.13-25824
08/30/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend time to file opening brief and appendix is approved. Due date: October 7, 2013.13-25827
10/07/2013Docketing StatementFiled Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-29802
10/08/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief with Statutory Addendum.13-30030
10/08/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume I.13-30031
10/08/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume II.13-30032
11/05/2013MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief (14 days)13-33230
11/05/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief Due November 21, 2013.13-33233
11/18/2013MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. Due Date: November 22, 2013.13-34702
11/18/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief Due November 22, 2013.13-34701
11/25/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.13-35466
12/26/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until January 3, 2014, to file and serve the reply brief.13-39263
01/06/2014MotionFiled Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief Second Request.14-00262
01/06/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief Due Date: January 10, 2014.14-00264
01/13/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-01197
01/13/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Supplemental Statutory Addendum.14-01198
01/13/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/05/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled Wednesday, May 7, 2014, at 2:30 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-07053
04/21/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice14-12832
05/06/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jesse N. Panoff, Esq. appearing on behalf of Appellant, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC).14-14648
05/07/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/11/2014BriefFiled NRAP 31(e) Notice of Supplemental Authority.14-30174
09/18/2014Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Douglas/Saitta. Gibbons, C.J., with whom Parraguirre and Cherry, J.J., agree, concurring in part and dissenting in part. 130 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 75. EN BANC14-30952
10/06/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing.14-33126
10/06/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Ariel E. Stern
10/10/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Silver State Schools Credit Union, Nevada Mortgage Bankers Association, Nevada Association of Mortgage Professionals, Inc. (Brief Supports Rehearing)14-33758
10/13/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief (amicus brief is attached as an exhibit.). (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/16/2014).14-33979
10/14/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of Mortgage Bankers Association in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (Amicus Brief is attached as an exhibit.) (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/16/14).14-34008
10/14/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Proposed Amicus Curiae Mortgage Bankers Association's Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement.14-34009
10/14/2014MotionFiled Motion Regarding Word Limit for Amicus Brief.14-34140
10/15/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of United Trustee's Association and American Legal & Financial Network.14-34352
10/15/2014MotionFiled Motion Regarding Word Limits for Amicus Brief by Proposed Amici United Trustees Association and American Legal & Financial Network.14-34353
10/16/2014MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document Motion by Nevada Land Title Association for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing14-34410
10/16/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement for Proposed Amici Curiae United Trustees Association and American Legal & Financial Network.
10/16/2014Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[We direct the clerk to (1) file the amicus brief received on October 10, 2014; (2) detach the proposed amicus brief attached to the motion filed on October 13, 2014, and file it separately herein; (3) detach the proposed amicus brief attached to the motion filed on October 14, 2014, and file it separately herein; (4) file the amicus brief received on October 15, 2014; and (5) file the amicus brief received on October 16, 2014. We have considered the briefs of amici curiae in resolving the petition for rehearing.]14-34519
10/16/2014BriefFiled Amicus Brief Brief of Amici Curiae Silver State Schools Credit Union Nevada Mortgage Bankers Association Nevada Association of Mortgage Professionals, Inc. (Brief Supports Rehearing)14-34520
10/16/2014BriefFiled Brief of Amici Curiae Supporting Respondent U.S. Bank's Petition for Rehearing and Supportin Affirmance of District Court. (DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON 10/13/2014 AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/16/14).14-34523
10/16/2014BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Mortgage Bankers Association's Brief in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. ((DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON 10/1/2014 AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/16/14).14-34525
10/16/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Proposed Amici Curiae Silver State Schools Credit Union's, Nevada Mortgage Bankers Association's, and Nevada Association of Mortgage Professionals, Inc.'s Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement.14-34532
10/16/2014BriefFiled Amicus Brief in Support of the Respondent U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of the Banc of America Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2008-A's Petition for Rehearing.14-34536
10/16/2014Other Incoming DocumentFiled Addendum (Volume 1) of Amici Curiae UTA and ALFN In Support of the Respondent U.S. Bank, N.A.'s Pettion for Rehearing Seeking Affirmance.14-34538
10/16/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement for Proposed Amici Curiae United Trustees Association and American Legal & Financial Network.14-34541
10/16/2014BriefFiled Brief of Amici Curiae Nevada Land Title Association.14-34542
11/10/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-36972
11/10/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
11/20/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 14, 2014.14-36972
12/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated December 17, 2014 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 59976/60091/60622/59630/56591/(60598/61038)/61655/61681/61082/62890/59210/62768/62944/62160/63871/(58530/59162)/61820/63444/53264/60050/63078. (Letter entered in 59976 as document no. 14-41986)