Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63092
Short Caption:JED PROPERTY VS. COASTLINE RE HOLDINGS NV CORP. C/W 63359Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:63092*, 63359Related Case(s):63359
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A657433Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/08/2013 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:12/09/2014 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/09/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/29/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
04/29/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-12441
04/29/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-12443
05/02/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bogatz & Associates, PC. Check No. 2030.
05/03/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement due: 20 days.13-12946
05/08/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld.13-13540
05/23/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.13-15296
06/10/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 6, 2013 at 2:00 pm.13-16943
06/12/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-17258
06/17/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Change of Firm Name and Firm Address. New name - Bogatz Law Group.13-17798
06/18/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.13-17955
06/20/2013MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 63092/63359.13-18112
07/02/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/29/12, 3/18/13, 4/22/13. To Court Reporter: Cynthia Georgilas.13-19349
07/12/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals. These consolidated appeals shall follow the briefing schedule currently set forth in Docket No. 63092, with appellant's opening brief and appendix addressing the issues in both appeals due on or before September 16, 2013. Nos. 63092/63359.13-20546
07/19/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Cynthia Georgilas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/29/12, 3/18/13 and 4/22/13.13-21237
09/03/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.13-25971
09/03/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Due October 15, 2013.13-25974
10/15/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 113-30877
10/15/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 213-30878
10/16/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 63092/63359.13-30916
10/16/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. 3. Nos. 63092/6335913-30930
11/19/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (Answering Brief attached) Nos. 63092/6335913-34786
11/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. We direct the clerk of this court to file the answering brief that was provisionally received in this court on November 20, 2013. Nos. 63092/6335913-35383
11/22/2013BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 63092/6335913-35384
12/20/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until December 31, 2013, to file and serve the reply brief. Nos. 63092/63359.13-38738
12/31/2013Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/31/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 63092/63359.13-39732
04/02/2014MotionFiled Bogatz Law Group's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for appellant JED Property, LLC.14-10348
04/11/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to remove Bogatz Law Firm as appellant's counsel in these appeals. Appellant continues to be represented by the Marquis Law Office, and thus, this order requires no action by appellant. Nos. 63092/63359.14-11767
05/30/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 63092/63359.14-17445
10/07/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes. Nos. 63092/63359.14-33356
11/14/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg and Joel D. Henriod of the law firm of Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP appearing on behalf of respondent Coastline Re Holdings NV Corp.) Nos. 63092/63359.14-37581
11/25/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-38920
12/02/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument, Joel D. Henriod for the Respondent.14-39253
12/09/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP14-KP/RP/NS.
03/05/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Parraguirre/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Parraguirre/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 11. Nos. 63092/63359 NNP14-RP/NS/KP15-06887
03/30/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 63092/6335915-09510
03/30/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 63092/63359
04/15/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 3, 2015.15-09510
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)