Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63176
Short Caption:LUNA (JENNIFER) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J328617Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/13/2015 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/13/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/13/2013Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Juvenile Matter.
05/13/2013Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-13954
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.13-13955
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.13-13956
08/08/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer Writ Petition. Real party in interest's answer due: 30 days. Petitioner: 15 days to file any reply.13-23340
09/05/2013MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Rebecca Luna's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer (First Request).13-26245
09/06/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Counsel (Chief Deputy District Attorney, Jennifer Kuhlman, in place and stead of Chief Deputy District Attorney, Steven S. Owens).13-26319
09/09/2013Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-26601
09/09/2013AppendixFiled Appendix -Real Party in Interest Appendix.13-26617
09/24/2013Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-28524
09/25/2013MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Rebecca Luna's Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-28567
10/02/2013MotionFiled Motion to Strike and/or in the Alternative Opposition to Real Party in Interest Rebecca Luna's Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-29443
10/09/2013MotionFiled Real Party In Interest Rebecca Luna's Opposition to Petitioner Jennifer Luna's Motion to Strike; and Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Mandamus.13-30157
01/22/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, Denying Motion to Strike, Directing Service of Petition, and Directing Answer. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption of this court's docket to add R.L. as a real party in interest. Petitioner shall have 11 days from the date of this order to serve the petition on R.L. and file a proof of service in this court. R.L. shall have 30 days from the date of service of the petition to file and serve an answer. Petitioner shall have 15 days thereafter to file and serve any reply.14-02229
01/27/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service. (Petition on R.L.)14-02775
02/27/2014Petition/WritFiled Real Party In Interest Rebecca Luna's Answer To Writ For Petition Of Mandamus.14-06447
02/27/2014AppendixFiled Real Party In Interest Rebecca Luna's Appendix.14-06449
04/01/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer. Real party in interest R.L. filed a motion for extension of time to file an answer to the petition for a writ of mandamus. We deny the September 5, 2013, motion for an extension of time as moot.14-10240
12/04/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-39423
01/07/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, February 13, 2015, @ 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-00720
01/28/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-03063
02/13/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP15-RP/MD/MC.
06/04/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Parraguirre/Cherry. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 30. SNP15-RP/MD/MC15-17022
06/29/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-19730
06/29/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.