The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63178
Short Caption:HORIZONS AT SEVEN HILLS VS. IKON HOLDINGSClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):63996
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A647850Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:ParraguirrePanel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/12/2014How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/13/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/13/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-13982
05/13/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.13-13984
05/13/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-13986
05/13/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Holland & Hart LLP - check no. 66005458.
05/16/2013Settlement NoticeNotice: Exemption from Settlement Program13-14540
05/17/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Case Appeal Statement.13-14666
05/24/2013MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Or, Alternatively, For Concurrent Hearings. Nos. 61940/62748/62587/63178.13-15526
05/29/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Patrick John Reilly and Nicole E. Lovelock as counsel for appellant).13-15846
05/31/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Formal Written Notice of Appearance (Kurt R. Bonds, Esq. of the law firm of Alverson, Taylor, Mortensen & Sanders appearing on behalf of Appellants).13-16027
06/03/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement13-16229
07/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Consolidate. Appellant has filed a motion to consolidate the appeal in this docket with consolidated writ petitions filed in in Docket Nos. 61940 and 62587 and another writ petition filed in Docket No. 62748. The motion to consolidate is therefore denied. Although the identified cases will not be formally consolidated, the cases will be clustered based on the overlapping legal issues to ensure that those issues are resolved in a consistent and efficient manner.13-21379
09/09/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension.Appellant shall have until September 20, 2013, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.13-26444
09/17/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Joint Appendix.13-27496
10/01/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 18, 2013.13-29183
10/18/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Extension of Time For Filing Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. (10 days)13-31477
11/04/2013MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Briefing Schedule.13-33111
11/05/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Non-Opposition To Motion For Extension Of Time For Filing Opening Brief and Appendix.13-33234
11/21/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix provisionally received in this court in October 28, 2013. Fn1[In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's October 18, 2013, motion for extension of time.]13-35131
11/21/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.13-35132
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1.13-35133
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2.13-35134
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3.13-35138
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4.13-35139
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 5.13-35140
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 6.13-35141
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 7.13-35142
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 8.13-35143
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 9.13-35144
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 10.13-35145
11/21/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 11.13-35146
12/03/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Community Association Management Executive Offices, Inc: motion for leave to appear as amicus curiae due: December 11, 2013.13-36255
12/12/2013MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Appellant Horizons at Seven Hills Homeowners Association.13-37524
12/12/2013OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms-Kemp Jones & Coulthard.
01/06/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Direct the clerk of this court to file the amicus brief that was provisionally received by this court on December 12. Respondent may respond to the amicus brief in its answering brief.14-00335
01/06/2014BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Community Association Management Executive Officers, Inc. in Support of Horizons at Seven Hills Homeowners Association.14-00336
01/07/2014MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix.14-00514
01/07/2014MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Clarification of Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.14-00597
01/23/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions for Extension of Time and for Clarification of Briefing Schedule. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a revised answering brief that addresses both the opening brief and CAMEO's amicus brief. Appellant shall then have 30 days from the date the answering brief is served to file and serve its reply brief. In light of this order, the clerk of this court is directed to return, unfiled, the answering brief that was provisionally received in this court on January 8, 2014. Fn1[Respondent is permitted to file its answering brief with up to 40 pages or 17, 000 words without seeking leave to exceed the length limitations set forth under NRAP 32(a)(7).]14-02358
02/25/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief & Response to Brief of Amicus Curiae.14-06108
02/25/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Vol. 1.14-06227
02/25/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Vol. 2.14-06228
02/25/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Vol. 3.14-06229
03/07/2014BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief by the State of Nevada, Department of Business and Industry, Real Estate Division in Support of Respondent.14-07310
03/21/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: April 3, 2014.14-09041
04/03/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule.14-10581
04/03/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief Due date: 4/11/14.14-10590
04/11/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule - Reply Brief.14-11658
04/11/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved.14-11690
04/16/2014BriefFiled Appellants Reply Brief.14-12303
04/16/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/12/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument.14-15188
12/22/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority.15-39173
01/06/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Appellant's Response To Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority.16-00345
04/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part and reversed in part." Fn1[The Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. EN BANC.16-13324
05/23/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-16051
05/23/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/10/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2016.16-16051
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/64281 (Letter entered in 66816 as document no. 16-24439.)