Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63179
Short Caption:STATE, DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION VS. DIST. CT. (AD AMERICA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66556
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A640157Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/06/2015 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/06/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/13/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality.
05/13/2013Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.13-13965
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 1. (CD included for all Appendices).13-13967
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 2.13-13969
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 3.13-13972
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 4.13-13973
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 5.13-13975
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 6.13-13976
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 7.13-13977
05/13/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 8.13-13978
07/03/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest's answer to writ petition due: 30 days. Petitioner: 15 days to file any reply.13-19524
07/25/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule in Connection With Cour's July 3, 2013 Order Directing Answer. (First Request)13-22020
08/06/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Real party in interest shall have until September 27, 2013, to file and serve the answer. Petitioner shall have until November 1, 2013, to file and serve any reply.13-23057
09/30/2013Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest, Ad America, Inc.'s Answer to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.13-29083
09/30/2013AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest, Ad America, Inc.'s Appendix to Answer to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition - Volume 1 of 2.13-29084
09/30/2013AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest Ad America, Inc.'s Appendix to Answer to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition - Volume 2 of 2.13-29086
10/03/2013MotionFiled Motion for Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of Writ Petition.13-29528
10/04/2013MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Amici Curiae Brief.13-29753
10/04/2013MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Amici Curiae Brief in Excess of 15 Pages.13-29754
10/11/2013MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and Motion for Excess Pages.13-30374
10/11/2013MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.13-30377
10/17/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall have until October 30, 2013, to file and serve any opposition to proposed amicus curiae's motions. In light of this order, we defer ruling on proposed amicus curiae's motions and petitioner's motion for an extension of time to file its reply brief. We defer ruling on the stay motion petitioner has filed in this court. Petitioner shall have until November 15, 2013, to file and serve a status report.13-31144
10/17/2013MotionFiled Real Party in Interest, Ad America, Inc.'s Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.13-31325
10/21/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Status Update Concerning Motion for Stay.13-31522
10/23/2013MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.13-31923
10/30/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner: Status Report due: December 2, 2013.13-32606
10/31/2013MotionFiled Supplement to Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief.13-32824
11/01/2013MotionFiled Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amici Brief in Excess of Fifteen Pages.13-32877
11/01/2013MotionFiled Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief.13-32878
11/01/2013Letter/IncomingFiled Letter/statement from Robert L. Eisenberg regarding the due date of their reply brief.13-32998
11/04/2013MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae.13-33153
11/04/2013MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion for Permission to File Amici Curiae Brief in Excess of 15 Pages.13-33154
12/03/2013MotionFiled Status Update Concerning Motion for Stay.13-36217
12/17/2013MotionFiled Real Party in Interest, Ad America, Inc.'s Motion to File Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of Writ Petition.13-38182
12/20/2013MotionFiled Opposition to Real Party in Interest's Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Stay.13-38789
12/30/2013MotionFiled Real Party in Interest, Ad America, Inc.'s Reply to Opposition to Motion to File Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of Writ Petition.13-39604
02/03/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner NDOT's Supplemental Status Report.14-03375
02/04/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. We conclude that a stay from this court is not warranted at this time. Thus, we deny the motion without prejudice to petitioner's right to renew the motion at a later date, if warranted. We grant the motion for leave to file an amicus brief, but deny the motion for excess pages. Thus, the clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the amicus brief that was provisionally received in this court on October 4, 2013. Amicus curiae shall have 11 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amicus brief not exceeding 7,000 words or 15 pages. Petitioner shall have 30 days after service of the amicus brief in which to file its reply. Real party in interest's motion for leave to file an opposition to petitioner's stay motion is denied.14-03602
02/19/2014BriefFiled Amici Curiae Brief of People's Initiative to Stop the Taking of Our Land and Carrie L. Jenkins In Support of Respondents. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/21/14 - page 5, line 25 (beginning with "Jeff Fontaine") through page 6, line 5 (ending with "Fontaine Deposition."); page 7, line 4 from "preserve" through and including footnote 2; and all of footnote 2.)14-05346
02/19/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Amici Curiae Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/21/14).
02/24/2014MotionFiled Motion to Strike Amici Appendix Documents, and to Strike Amici Brief's references to the Documents.14-05922
03/03/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Strike Amici Appendix Documents, and to Strike Amici Brief's References to the Documents.14-06852
03/05/2014MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion to Strike.14-07110
03/18/2014MotionFiled Motion for One-Week Extension of Time for Reply.14-08747
03/31/2014AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix to Reply in Support of Petition for Writ - Vol. 9.14-10057
04/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part to Strike and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. We order the clerk of this court to strike amici curiae's appendix from the record. With regard to the amici curiae brief, the clerk of this court shall strike only the following portions of the brief: page 5, line 25 (beginning with "Jeff Fontaine") through page 6, line 5 (ending with "Fontaine Deposition."); page 7, line 4 from "preserve" through and including footnote 2; and all of footnote 2. We direct the clerk of this court to file the reply received on March 28, 2014.14-12683
04/21/2014Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.14-12686
08/04/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-25395
08/05/2014Letter/IncomingFiled Letter to Clerk Re: Oral Argument.14-25534
09/15/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice. (R. Vaughn Gourley, Esq. attorney for District Court Intervenor, Clark County Credit Union)14-30498
09/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Monday, November 3, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-31743
10/01/2014Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Brian C. Padgett requesting continuance of oral argument.14-32709
10/10/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice, Senior Deputy Attorney General, Karissa D. Neff for the Petitioner.14-33667
10/10/2014MotionFiled Real Party In Interest, Ad America, Inc.'s Motion To Continue Oral Argument Setting.14-33713
10/13/2014MotionFiled Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Continue Oral Argument.14-33875
10/21/2014BriefFiled Petitioner's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.14-35046
10/22/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-35261
10/23/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. The oral argument presently scheduled for November 3, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. is vacated. The clerk of this court shall schedule this appeal for oral argument before the court on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-35364
11/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, January 6, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-37883
12/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-42019
01/02/2015BriefFiled Real Party in Interest, Ad America, Inc's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.15-00006
01/02/2015BriefFiled Petitioner's Response to Ad America's Supplemental Authorities.15-00020
01/06/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
06/25/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." The clerk of this court shall issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to vacate its previous order and enter a new order granting summary judgment in favor of NDOT on the inverse condemnation cause of action. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry/Saitta/Pickering. Gibbons, J., concurring. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 41. EN BANC15-19376
06/25/2015WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Robert L. Eisenberg for service upon Judge Allan R. Earl.15-19411
07/01/2015WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Allan R. Earl on June 29, 2015.15-20159
07/20/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-21805
07/20/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publisher's with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 63179/64064/64260/61553/63731/6381015-33995