Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63274
Short Caption:MANNING (MALCOLM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73666, 73666-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C285415Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/09/2014 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/09/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/28/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
05/28/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)13-15572
06/07/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:12/17/12 & 1/9/13.13-16764
06/28/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/21/12;13-19155
07/02/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension Due to Missing Transcripts (Fast Track Statement).13-19424
07/05/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: September 5, 2013.13-19714
07/05/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Transcripts. Court recorders Ramsey and Boyd' certificate due: 14 days. Fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached.] Fn2[If either of the court recorders believes she is not responsible for filing and delivering the requested transcripts, she shall inform this court in writing within 7 days from the date of this order.]13-19715
07/11/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcripts.13-20298
07/19/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Michelle L. Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:1/11/13.13-21236
07/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Victoria Boyd's certificate due: 45 days. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: 60 days.13-21394
09/13/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Victoria Boyd stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No dates listed.13-27066
09/20/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Bench Conferences and Evidence.13-28138
09/30/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 25, 2013.13-29118
10/01/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Transcripts. Court recorder Victoria Boyd: Certificate of Delivery due: 20 days. Fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached.]13-29236
10/29/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcriopts.13-32519
10/30/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Ms. Boyd: Certificate of Delivery due: 45 days. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 65 days.13-32605
01/02/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time for Court Recorder to Transcribe Audio Played for Jury During Closing Argument.14-00040
01/17/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until January 24, 2014, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix.14-01721
01/17/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File FTS in Excess of Type Volume Limitations.14-01751
01/17/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Vol. I.14-01753
01/17/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Vol. II.14-01754
01/17/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Vol. III.14-01755
01/17/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Vol. IV.14-01756
01/17/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Vol. V.14-01757
01/17/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement, Vol. VI.14-01758
01/17/2014MotionFiled Motion to Transmit Exhibits.14-01759
01/27/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation and Directing Full Briefing. We conclude that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. The clerk of this court shall reject the fast track statement received via E-Flex on January 17, 2014. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief.14-02681
02/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part and Denying Motion in Part. District Court Clerk: State's Exhibits 1 & 1A, 3 & 3A, and 43 & 43A due: 20 days.14-03444
02/14/2014MotionFiled Appellants' Renewed Motion for Transmission of Original Exhibits.14-04979
02/18/2014BriefFiled Opening Brief.14-05262
02/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix Vol VII.14-05264
02/27/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Directing Clerk to Transmit Original Exhibits. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court the original exhibits marked as State's Exhibits 2 and 2A in district court case number C285415-1.14-06478
03/21/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-09037
04/21/2014BriefFiled Reply Brief.14-12785
04/21/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
10/06/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-33051
10/15/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-34297
11/25/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-38913
12/09/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP14 JH/MD/MC.
05/07/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Douglas.131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26. SNP14-JH/MD/MC15-13960
05/22/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.15-15816
06/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days.15-19588
07/13/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.15-20624
09/25/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-29127
10/02/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.15-29951
11/06/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC.15-33940
12/01/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned original exhibits 1, 1A, 2, 2A, 3, 3A to District Court Clerk.15-36483
12/01/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 09, 2015.15-36483