Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63284
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF ROBERT C. MURRAYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P076035Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/05/2013 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/14/2014 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/14/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/29/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/29/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-15735
05/29/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-15741
05/31/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet.
05/31/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Now! Services, Inc. Check No. 1175.13-16094
06/05/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel.13-16440
06/18/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-17950
06/19/2013Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement.13-18085
06/27/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 15, 2013, at 10:00 a.m.13-18936
08/27/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-25373
09/03/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.13-25873
09/27/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate Regarding Transcripts. (No Transcript Requested)13-28937
10/01/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly A. Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/15/13.13-29282
12/02/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 9, 2013.13-36041
12/09/2013BriefFiled Opening Brief -Appellants' Opening Brief.13-37064
12/10/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. 1.13-37207
12/10/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol.2.13-37209
12/23/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Respondent's Answering Brief.13-39057
12/23/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: February 6, 2014.13-39061
02/07/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-04078
03/07/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-07317
03/07/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/25/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-20885
07/02/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Non-Availability.14-21689
07/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, October 14, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shalle be limited to 30 minutes.14-24878
09/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-32456
10/14/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP14 - JH/MD/MC.
03/05/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Douglas. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 8. SNP14-JH/MD/MC15-06880
03/30/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-09529
03/30/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 3, 2015.15-09529
07/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. (Letter dated July 21, 2015) Nos. 63284/61059/64623/59638/60527/63076/63683/62792.15-22234