Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63308
Short Caption:BARBARA ANN HOLLIER TRUST VS. SHACK C/W 64047Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:63308*, 64047Related Case(s):53039, 64047
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A498513Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/14/2013 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:05/11/2015 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:05/11/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/04/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
06/04/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-16347
06/04/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-16349
06/04/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.13-16351
06/10/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Andrew M. Leavitt. Check No. 16432.
06/11/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Case Appeal Statement.13-17041
06/12/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement due: 20 days.13-17194
06/14/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld.13-17683
06/21/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 09/12/13.13-18296
07/02/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.13-19467
11/21/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests a 90 day extension of time for these appeals to remain in the settlement program. Nos. 63308/64047.13-35196
11/26/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to March 11, 2014. Nos. 63308/64047.13-35688
02/18/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 63308/64047.14-05197
02/25/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: Consolidate Appeals/No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. Nos. 63308/64047.14-06174
03/11/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/7/12, 9/21/12, 10/19/12, 11/2/12, 11/8/12, 11/13/12, 11/14/12, 11/15/12, 11/16/12, 11/19/12, 2/21/13, 2/26/13, 3/21/13, 4/9/13, 7/11/13. To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen.14-07885
04/24/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Carrie Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/7/12, 9/21/12, 10/19/12, 11/2/12, 11/8/12, 11/13/12, 11/15/12, 11/16/12, 11/19/12, 2/21/13, 3/21/13, 7/11/13. Nos. 3308/64067.14-13277
05/22/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 3, 2014. Nos. 63308/64047.14-16758
06/03/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service - Receipt of Copy by Respondents of Appellants' Appendix Vols. 1-17 and Electronic copy on CD-ROM. Nos. 63308/64047.14-17973
06/04/2014MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. Nos. 63308/64047.14-18087
06/05/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1-17.14-18314
06/27/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Brief Exceeding Type-Volume Limitation. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellants' opening brief received on June 4, 2014. Answering Brief due: 30 days. Nos. 63308/64047.14-21177
06/27/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 63308/64047.14-21178
07/25/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent shall have until August 4, 2014, to file and serve the answering brief. Nos. 63308/64047.14-24310
08/04/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.14-25373
08/04/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief Due Date: August 8, 2014.14-25439
08/11/2014MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. Nos. 63308/64047.14-26179
08/11/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief -Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief on Appeal. Nos. 63308/64047.14-26180
08/19/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Respondents' Answering Brief Motion. Respondents: 5 days to file an 18,907 word answering brief that fully complies with NRAP 32(a)(4)-(5)'s formatting requirements . The clerk of this court shall reject respondents' answering brief, which was electronically received on August 11, 2014. Appellants: 30 days to file any reply brief. Nos. 63308/64047.14-27183
08/19/2014BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief on Appeal. Nos. 63308/64047. .14-27337
09/16/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: September 25, 2014. Nos. 63308/64047.14-30649
09/26/2014MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation.14-32022
10/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Brief Exceeding Type-Volume Limitation. We direct the clerk of this court to file the 15,649-word reply brief that was provisionally received in this court on September 26, 2014. Nos. 63308/64047.14-35563
10/24/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 63308/64047.14-35564
10/24/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 63308/64047.
02/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 63308/64047.15-05989
03/27/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 11, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-09323
04/27/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-12749
05/11/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Association of Counsel. Nos. 63308/6404715-14250
05/11/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Panel. NNP15-NS/KP/MG.
08/06/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in Part and Reversed in Part." Before Saitta, Gibbons, and Pickering, JJ. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Saitta, Gibbons, Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 59. Nos. 63308/64047.15-23673
08/21/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 63308/64047.15-25466
08/21/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Andrew M. Leavitt.
08/24/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Change of Address. Respondent counsel, Joel Schwarz is now with the firm Dickinson Wright.15-25604
08/25/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Petition for Limited Rehearing.15-25687
08/25/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Joel Z. Schwarz
09/28/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. Appellant's petition for rehearing filed on August 21, 2015, and respondents' petition for limited rehearing filed on August 25, 2015 are hereby denied. NRAP 40(c). Nos. 63308/64047.15-29271
10/26/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 63308/64047.15-32596
10/26/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 63308/64047.
11/05/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 29, 2015.15-32596