Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63382
Short Caption:THE CADLE CO. VS. WOODS & ERICKSON C/W 63790Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:63382*, 63790Related Case(s):63790
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A564243Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:06/24/2013 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/10/2014 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/10/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/14/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
06/14/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-17652
06/14/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-17655
06/14/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.13-17657
06/14/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk Addendum to Notice of Appeal packet filed 06/13/201313-17697
06/17/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Case Appeal Statement.13-17844
06/19/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Adams Law Group, LTD. Check No. 6588.
06/19/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.13-18109
06/24/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost.13-18557
07/09/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-20063
07/30/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 4, 2013 at 1pm.13-22375
09/23/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 63382/63790.13-28336
10/08/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: Consolidate Appeals/No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. Nos. 63382/63790.13-30076
10/23/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/04/13 thru 3/07/13, 4/15/13, 4/17/13, 4/22/13, 4/23/13, 4/30/13, 5/01/13, 5/02/13, 5/07/13, 5/09/13, 6/13/13 and 7/16/13 To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins.13-32003
12/19/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: no dates given.13-38633
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.14-00304
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 214-00305
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.14-00306
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4.14-00307
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5.14-00308
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6.14-00311
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 7.14-00312
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 8.14-00313
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 9.14-00314
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 10.14-00315
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 11.14-00317
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 12.14-00318
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 13.14-00319
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 14.14-00393
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 15.14-00394
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 16.14-00395
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 17.14-00396
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 18.14-00397
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 19.14-00398
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 20.14-00399
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 21.14-00400
01/08/2014BriefFiled Appellants Opening Brief.14-00654
01/31/2014AppendixFiled Supplement to Joint Appendix Volume 22. Nos. 63382/63790.14-03281
02/05/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 63382/63790.14-03839
03/10/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 63382/6379014-07457
03/10/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/28/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 63382/63790.14-17185
07/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, September 10, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-23276
08/26/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 63382/63790.14-28208
09/10/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. Nos. 63382/63790.
03/26/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part as modified and reversed in part." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 15. EN BANC Nos. 63382/6379015-09143
04/20/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 63382/6379015-11852
04/20/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 63382/63790
04/29/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 23, 2015.15-11852
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)