Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63492
Short Caption:BISCAY VS. MGM RESORTS INT'L.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A667692Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Hardesty for Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/18/2013 / Cherry, JackSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/05/2014How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/27/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
06/27/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-19007
06/27/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-19010
07/10/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kang & Associates, PLLC. Check No. 2312.
07/10/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant: due: 20 days.13-20244
07/18/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jack C. Cherry.13-21056
07/29/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-22282
09/30/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for Friday, October 4, 2013, at 10:00 p.m.13-29155
10/02/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Firm Address Change. (Patrick W. Kang)13-29360
11/04/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-33139
11/12/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.13-33699
11/20/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.13-35002
02/11/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-04469
02/13/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix.14-04905
03/03/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-06881
04/18/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No Reply Brief Filed.
06/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order.14-18304
06/05/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
04/16/2015OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
06/19/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Lew Brandon Jr. to replace Troy Peyton as counsel for the Respondents).15-18804
06/22/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Lew Brandon Jr. to replace Troy Peyton as counsel for the Respondents).15-18987
07/02/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before Hardesty, C.J., Gibbons, and Saitta, JJ. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Hardesty/Saitta. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 46. NNP1515-20186
07/27/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-22586
07/27/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/10/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 31, 2015.15-22586