Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63545
Short Caption:HARBER VS. DIST. CT. (NELSON)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):63432, 66772, 68292, 77254, 77473
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D411537Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2013Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Mark A. Solomon.
07/09/2013Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition.13-19982
07/09/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.13-19983
07/09/2013MotionFiled Emergency Motion under NRAP 27(e) For Stay to Issue By 5:00 P.M. on July 9, 2013, Pending Resolution of Writ Proceedings; NRAP 27(e) Certificate.13-19985
07/09/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice NRAP 26.1 Disclosure13-19986
07/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy.13-20130
07/10/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy.13-20131
07/10/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplement to Petition and Directing Answer. Petitioner shall have until Monday, July 15, 2013, at 4 p.m. to file and serve a supplement to the petition demonstrating why extraordinary relief is warranted at this time, given that the issues can ultimately be raised on appeal from a final judgment. The real parties in interest shall have 11 days after the supplement is served to file and serve an answer to the petition, as supplemented. We defer ruling on petitioner's motion for a stay at this time. All documents submitted in response to this order shall be filed and served personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City. For purposes of this petition, we suspend application of NRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(ii)-(iv) and NRAP 26(b)(1)(B).13-20152
07/15/2013Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition For Writ of Prohibition Pursuant to July 10, 2013, Order Directing Supplement.13-20668
07/16/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy of Supplement to Petition For Writ of Prohibition Pursuant to July 10, 2013, Order Directing Supplement (Robert P. Dickerson, Esq.).13-20816
07/16/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy of Supplement to Petition For Writ of Prohibition Pursuant to July 10, 2013, Order Directing Supplement (Rhonda K. Forsberg, Esq.).13-20817
07/19/2013MotionFiled Opposition To Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27 (e) For Stay To Issue By 5:00 p.m. On July 9, 2013, Pending Resolution Of Writ Proceedings13-21180
07/19/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice NRAP 26.1 Disclosure13-21210
07/25/2013MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Emergency Motion.13-22043
07/29/2013Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition.13-22234
07/29/2013MotionFiled Request for Ruling on Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) Filed by the ELN Trust on July 9, 2013.13-22266
07/30/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Temporary Stay. We temporarily stay the portions of the divorce decree directing the transfer of the following assets from the Eric L. Nelson Nevada Trust to the LSN Nevada Trust: the Lindell Property; the rental properties owned by Banone, LLC; the JB Ramos Trust Note Receivable; and a percentage interest in the Russell Road Property. The temporary stay shall remain in effect pending further order of this court. Additionally, petitioner shall have 11 days from the date of this order to file any reply to the answer to the petition.13-22458
08/12/2013Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition.13-23610
08/12/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Volume 2.13-23612
04/21/2014MotionFiled Motion to Dissolve Temporary Stay.14-12734
04/24/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioner shall have until May 7, 2014, to file and serve an opposition to real party in interest's motion to dissolve temporary stay.14-13340
05/07/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Dissolve Temporary Stays.14-14782
05/15/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real party in interest shall have until May 21, 2014, to file and serve the reply to opposition to motion to dissolve temporary stays.14-15811
05/20/2014MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dissolve Temporary Stay.14-16466
05/23/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petitions for Writs of Prohibition. "We deny these petitions for writs of prohibitions without prejudice to the right of any aggrieved party to file an appeal from the final judgment." We vacate all orders granting temporary stays in these petitions. Fn1[ In light of this order, we deny as moot the motions for stay and motions for a ruling on and/or to dissolve temporary stays filed in both cases. We further deny as moot the July 23, 2013, motion for an extension of time to file a reply in Docket No. 63432 and the July 29, 2013, request for a ruling in Docket No. 63545. Finally, we grant the May 15, 2014, request for an extension of time to file a reply in Docket No. 63432, and we have considered the reply incorporated in that request.] Nos. 63432/3545. SNP14-JH/MD/MC.14-16990
06/17/2014RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur14-19917
06/17/2014Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed