The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63581
Short Caption:VILLAGE LEAGUE TO SAVE INCLINE VS. STATE BD. OF EQUALIZATIONClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):43441, 56030, 73835
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0306922Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:None for Justice Pickering<br/>None for Justice Stiglich
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:11/03/2014 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/03/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/15/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Snell & Wilmer. Check no. 1083.
07/15/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-20577
07/15/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-20579
07/16/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:13-20733
07/26/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
07/26/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (Second NOA). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel N. Azevedo for appellants he represents.)13-22131
07/29/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested.13-22311
07/31/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Norman Azevedo. Check No. 6127.
08/06/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-22978
08/15/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-24122
09/11/2013MotionFiled Motion for Stay of July 1, 2013 Order and Reinstatement of Partial Stay of February 8, 2013 State Board of Equalization Decision Pending Resolution of this Appeal; Supporting Points and Authorities.13-26842
09/12/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Responsible Attorney (Herbert B. Kaplan, Deputy District Attorney in place and stead of David Creekman, Chief Deputy District Attorney).13-26949
09/12/2013MotionFiled Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Stay of July 1, 2013 Order.13-26971
09/12/2013MotionFiled Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Stay of July 1, 2013 Order and Reinstatement of Partial Stay of February 8, 2013 State Board of Equalization Decision Pending Resolution of This Appeal.13-27027
10/01/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Stay. We grant the motion and stay the July 1, 2013, order entered in District Court Case No. CV03-06922 pending resolution of this appeal.13-29184
11/12/2013MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.13-33640
11/12/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: November 25, 2013. Appellants represented by Sullen Fulstone.13-33845
11/25/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief (cd Included).13-35545
11/25/2013BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief (Appellants Ellen Bakst, Jane Barnhart, Carol Buck, Daniel Schwartz, Larry Watkins, Don Wilson, Patricia Wilson & Agnieszka Winkler).13-35548
11/25/2013MotionFiled Motion of Village League Appellants for an Extension of Time for Filing Opening Brief - Second Request.13-35647
11/25/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Village League's Opening Brief Due Date: December 9, 2013.13-35649
11/27/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1.13-35983
11/27/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 2.13-35984
11/27/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 3.13-35986
11/27/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 4.13-35987
11/27/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 5.13-35988
11/27/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 6.13-35989
11/27/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 7.13-35990
11/27/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 8.13-35991
12/10/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (Appellants Andrew Whyman, Dean R. Ingemanson, Dean R. Ingemanson Trust, J. Robert Anderson, Kathy Nelson, Kathy Nelson Trust, Larry D. & Maryanne B. Ingemanson Trust, Les Barta, Maryanne Ingemanson, Village League to Save Incline Assets, Inc).13-37150
12/10/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix.13-37161
12/18/2013MotionFiled Motion for Substitution of Dean Ingemanson in the Place of the Deceased Maryanne Ingemanson as Trustee of the Appellant Larry D. and Maryanne B. Ingemanson Trust; Supporting Points and Authorities.13-38511
12/26/2013BriefFiled Respondent State Board of Equalization's Answering Brief. (Appellants Ellen Bakst, Jane Barnhart, Carol Buck, Daniel Schwartz, Larry Watkins, Don Wilson, Patricia Wilson & Agnieszka Winkler-Opening Brief).13-39247
01/09/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Non-Participation (Respondent Norma Green, hereby gives this Court notice that Churchill County and the Churchill County Assessor Norma Green does not intend to participate in this appeal, nor file a brief herein).14-00899
01/13/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. State, Bd. of Equalization Answering Brief due: January 16, 2014.14-01179
01/13/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Washoe Co., Washoe Co. Treasurer, and Washoe Co. Assessor Answering Brief due: January 16, 2014.14-01182
01/13/2014MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Celeste Hamilton as a Party to This Appeal or Extend the Time to File an Answering Brief.14-01253
01/14/2014MotionFiled Respondent State Board of Equalization's Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Celeste Hamilton as a Party To this Appeal or Extend Time to File an Answering Brief.14-01434
01/15/2014BriefFiled Respondent State Board of Equalization's Answering Brief.14-01540
01/15/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix, Vol I, Part I.14-01603
01/15/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix, Volume II, Part I.14-01611
01/15/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix, Volume III, Part I.14-01612
01/16/2014MotionFiled Notice of Washoe County Respondents' Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Celeste Hamilton as a Party to this Appeal or Extend the Time to File an Answering Brief.14-01693
01/17/2014BriefFiled Washoe County Respondents' Answering Brief.14-01810
01/17/2014MotionFiled Response of Village League Taxpayers to Pershing County Assessor Motion to Dismiss or Extend Time to File Answering Brief.14-01842
01/21/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder to Village League's Response to Pershing County's Motion to Dismiss.14-02052
01/23/2014MotionFiled Reply to Response to Celeste Hamilton's Motion to Dismiss.14-02303
01/24/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief (Bakst Appellant's).14-02487
01/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: February 24, 2014.14-02588
01/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Substitute Personal Representative and Dismiss Respondents Celeste Hamilton and Norma Green. Counsel for appellant Maryanne Ingemanson, Trustee of the Larry D. and Maryanne B. Ingemanson Trust, has filed a notice informing this court of Maryanne's death and a motion to substitute Dean Ingemanson in the place of Maryanne as Trustee of the Larry D. and Maryanne B. Ingemanson Trust, pointing out that Dean is named as Maryanne's successor trustee. The motion is granted. The motion to dismiss Hamilton from this appeal is granted. We conclude that Green should likewise be dismissed from this appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption in accordance with this order. Fn1[We deny as moot Hamilton's alternative request to extend the time for filing an answering brief.]14-02622
02/12/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Village League & Bakst Appellant's).14-04529
02/12/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: March 17, 2014.14-04579
03/11/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request)14-07892
03/17/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellants' Reply Briefs due: March 26, 2014.14-08555
03/26/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Third Request). (Village League Appellants)14-09641
03/27/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (Bakst Appellants)14-09682
04/02/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Fourth Request - Village League Appellants).14-10519
04/07/2014MotionFiled Motion to Exceed the Type-Volume Limitation.14-10884
04/07/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Correction to Opening Brief.14-10921
04/25/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions for Extension of Time and for Leave to File Oversized Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the Viallage League appellants' reply brief and second supplement appendix, both of which were received on April 7, 2014.14-13371
04/25/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief with addendum - Village League.14-13372
04/25/2014AppendixFiled Appellants' Second Supplemental Appendix - Village League.14-13373
04/25/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/04/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-25392
08/20/2014BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities to Respondent State Board of Equalization's Answering Brief to Appellants' (Intervenors') Opening Brief.14-27401
09/09/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Errata (Answering Brief)14-29775
09/09/2014BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities to Respondent State Board of Equalization's Answering Brief to Appellants' Opening Brief.14-29776
09/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Monday, November 3, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-31745
10/17/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Errata (to State Board's Answering Brief) .14-34702
10/22/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-35263
11/03/2014OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
11/03/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
11/15/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Filed Notice of Change of Address (Norman Azevedo).16-35496
01/26/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Fn1[The honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 1.17-02861
02/21/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-05951
02/21/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2017.17-05951