Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63644
Short Caption:VEIL VS. BENNETTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI24084Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:11/04/2014 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/04/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/22/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality.
07/22/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-21422
07/22/2013Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 2211for $250.00 returned to Keith Loomis.
07/22/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-21424
07/23/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:13-21669
08/20/2013Docketing StatementFiled Respondents' Docketing Statement (NRAP 14).13-24579
08/26/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement.13-25268
09/23/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time and Regarding Transcript Request Form. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement provisionally received in this court on August 26, 2013. Appellant: Transcipt Request due: 5 days.13-28261
09/23/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-28262
09/26/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.13-28845
11/19/2013MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time of Thirty Days Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief.13-34871
11/19/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief Due Date: December 20, 2013.13-34875
12/20/2013BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (LAST SENTENCE ON PAGE 2 (LINE 17) THRU PAGE 3 (LINE 3) STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/3/14).13-38891
12/20/2013AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (PAGES JA0001-0004 STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/3/14).13-38892
01/17/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service (Appellant's Opening Brief).14-01795
01/22/2014BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/3/14).
01/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/3/14).
02/14/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Strike.14-05030
02/18/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.14-05186
02/18/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion to extend the time to file the reply brief is approved. Due date: March 24, 2014.14-05188
03/06/2014MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike.14-07229
03/10/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Respondent's Answering Brief.14-07533
03/12/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. We grant the extension of time, and direct the clerk of this court to file the opposition to appellant's motion to strike and countermotion to strike, provisionally received by this court on March 6, 2014. Appellant shall have until March 17, 2014, to file and serve any reply. Fn1[We defer ruling on appellant's motion to strike at this time.]14-08000
03/12/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike, Counter Motion to Strike or in the Alternative Motion to Expand Record on Appeal for De Novo Hearing.14-08002
03/17/2014MotionFiled Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike, and Opposition to Respondents Counter Motion to Strike or in the Alternative Motion to Expand Record on Appeal for De Novo Hearing.14-08521
03/20/2014MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.14-09017
03/21/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply to the opposition to the counter motion to strike due: March 31, 2014.14-09131
03/28/2014MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Counter Motion to Strike or in the Alternative Motion to Expand Record on Appeal for De Novo Hearing.14-09814
04/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Strike Answering Brief, Granting Countermotion to Strike Appendix, and Denying Motion to Expand Record on Appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to strike the answering brief and appendix filed on January 22, 2014. Respondent's Amended Answering Brief due: 15 days. We direct the clerk of this court to strike pages JA0001-JA0004 of the joint appendix and the last sentence on page 2 of the opening brief beginnging with, "They ultimately signed orders . . ." and ending on page 3 with, (JA 0001-0004) (emphasis added)." fn1[In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's March 20, 2014, motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief.]14-10604
04/16/2014BriefFiled Answering Brief.14-12238
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.14-12239
05/19/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: May 23, 2014.14-16251
05/23/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-16930
05/23/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/11/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-30066
09/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, November 4, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-31747
10/22/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-35265
11/03/2014Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Ariana Cramer with KRNV News 4 Television requesting permission to bring camaras into courtroom.14-36263
11/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Ariana Cramer of KRNV News 4 is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m.14-36289
11/04/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
04/30/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons. Pickering, J., with whom Hardesty, C.J., and Cherry, J., agree, concurring in the result only. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 22. EN BANC15-13101
05/26/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-15937
05/26/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 27, 2015.15-15937
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)