Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63731
Short Caption:DAVIS VS. EWALEFO (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D468447Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/05/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from McFarling Benson. Check no. 1790.
08/05/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-22939
08/05/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Expedited Filing Deadlines/Child Custody. Transcript request due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement & Appendix due: 40 days.13-22942
08/05/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED Confidential Civil Cover Sheet.
08/09/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/09/13 & 04/22/13. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services.13-23398
08/21/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-24636
09/10/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix.13-26645
09/24/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Statement and Appendix.13-28492
09/24/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/09/13 & 04/22/13.13-28506
10/04/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally received on September 24, 2013. Respondent: Fast Track Response due: 20 days.13-29617
10/04/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Statement.13-29619
10/04/2013AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix.13-29620
10/18/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Fast Track Response due: November 1, 2013.13-31336
11/05/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Statement.13-33280
11/05/2013Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
07/31/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Pickering, J., dissenting. NNP14-KP/RP/NS.14-24976
08/06/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.14-25822
08/06/2014Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Emily M. McFarling.
08/20/2014Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Pickering, J., dissenting.14-27363
08/26/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.14-28249
08/29/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.14-28551
09/15/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: September 22, 2014.14-30457
09/17/2014Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.14-30848
07/02/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Opinion on Reconsideration. "Petition for reconsideration granted; affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Dissent: Parraguirre/Saitta 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 45.15-20176
07/27/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-22587
07/27/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/10/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 31, 2015.15-22587
11/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publisher's with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 63179/64064/64260/61553/63731/63810 (Letter entered in 63179 as document no. 15-33995)