Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63747
Short Caption:MUNOZ VS. BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 37908Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/19/2013 / Greiner, JillSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/24/2014How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/07/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
08/07/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-23193
08/07/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-23195
08/12/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of John J. Gezelin. Check No. 1223.
08/13/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.13-23679
08/19/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jill I. Greiner.13-24364
08/26/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Statement of Evidence NRAP 9 [c].13-25147
08/26/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-25148
08/26/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge.13-25150
08/27/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 26, 2013, at 9:00 a.m.13-25395
08/27/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Notice to Appear for Mandatory Settlement Conference.13-25396
08/29/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service (docketing statement served on settlement judge).13-25688
10/01/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-29222
10/08/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.13-30100
10/21/2013MotionFiled Stipulation to Stay Briefing Schedule.13-31546
02/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Suspend Transcript Request and Briefing Deadlines and Revising Briefing Schedule. Appellants: Transcript request due: 15 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days.14-03469
02/14/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.14-04996
04/04/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice NRAP 26.1 Disclosure.14-10719
04/04/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.14-10763
04/04/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vols. 1 & 2.14-10765
05/05/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-14393
06/04/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-18248
06/04/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/17/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-30856
09/24/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorney (Jeffrey R. Sylvester, Esq. of the law firm Sylvester & Polednak, Ltd. as Counsel for Respondent, Branch Banking and Trust Company in place and stead of Todd R. Alexander, Esq.).14-31705
09/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, November 4, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-31748
10/08/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address for the Law Offices of John J. Gezelin and John J. Gezelin, Esq.14-33384
10/09/2014MotionFiled Stipulation and Request to Reschedule Oral Argument.14-33534
10/22/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-35266
10/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The request to reschedule oral argument is denied. The oral argument presently scheduled for November 14, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.14-35477
10/24/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
04/30/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 23. EN BANC15-13102
05/26/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-16035
05/26/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 28, 2015.15-16035
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)