Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63790
Short Caption:THE CADLE CO. VS. WOODS & ERICKSON C/W 63382Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:63382*, 63790Related Case(s):63382
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A564243Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/13/2013 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/10/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
08/13/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-23739
08/13/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-23743
08/13/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost.13-23788
08/16/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Adams Law Group, Ltd. Check No. 10021.
09/09/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-26503
09/23/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 63382/63790.13-28339
10/08/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: Consolidate Appeals/No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. Nos. 63382/63790.13-30076
10/23/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/04/13 thru 3/07/13, 4/15/13, 4/17/13, 4/22/13, 4/23/13, 4/30/13, 5/01/13, 5/02/13, 5/07/13, 5/09/13, 6/13/13 and 7/16/13 To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins.13-32003
12/19/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: no dates given.13-38633
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.14-00304
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 214-00305
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.14-00306
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4.14-00307
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5.14-00308
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6.14-00311
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 7.14-00312
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 8.14-00313
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 9.14-00314
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 10.14-00315
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 11.14-00317
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 12.14-00318
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 13.14-00319
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 14.14-00393
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 15.14-00394
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 16.14-00395
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 17.14-00396
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 18.14-00397
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 19.14-00398
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 20.14-00399
01/06/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 21.14-00400
01/08/2014BriefFiled Appellants Opening Brief.14-00654
01/31/2014AppendixFiled Supplement to Joint Appendix Volume 22. Nos. 63382/63790.14-03281
02/05/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 63382/63790.14-03839
03/10/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 63382/6379014-07457
03/10/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/28/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 63382/63790.14-17185
07/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, September 10, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-23276
08/26/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 63382/63790.14-28208
09/10/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. Nos. 63382/63790.
03/26/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part as modified and reversed in part." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 15. EN BANC Nos. 63382/6379015-09143
04/20/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 63382/6379015-11852
04/20/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 63382/63790
04/29/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 23, 2015.15-11852
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)