Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63810
Short Caption:D & D TIRE VS. OUELLETTECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1101962Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/21/2013 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/13/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
08/15/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-24056
08/15/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-24059
08/19/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Holland & Hart LLP. Check No. 67005072.
08/19/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED - District Court Minutes.
08/21/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick.13-24659
08/21/2013MotionFiled Stipulation Regarding Settlement Judge.13-24695
09/04/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-26137
09/06/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties filed a Stipulation Regarding Settlement Judge. We disapprove of the sitpulation. The assigned settlement judge shall continue with settlement proceedings.13-26334
09/18/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 11/01/13 @ 9:30 am.13-27731
12/09/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-37023
12/16/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.13-38020
12/31/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/07/13. To Court Reporter: Constance S. Eisenberg.13-39646
03/12/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.14-08050
03/13/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief Due Date: 4/14/14.14-08164
04/14/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.14-11847
04/14/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume I.14-11850
04/14/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume II.14-11851
04/14/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume III.14-11853
04/14/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume IV.14-11854
04/14/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume V.14-11855
04/14/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume VI.14-11856
04/14/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume VII.14-11857
05/12/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Respondent to File His Answering Brief. (30 days)14-15287
05/12/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief Due Date: June 13, 2014.14-15289
06/10/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-18795
07/08/2014MotionFiled Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.14-22172
07/08/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief Due Date August 1, 2014.14-22176
08/04/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-25299
08/05/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-04859
07/02/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Saitta, Gibbons, and Pickering, JJ. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 47. NNP1515-20189
07/27/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-22596
07/27/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/01/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 26, 2015.15-22596
11/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publisher's with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 63179/64064/64260/61553/63731/63810 (Letter entered in 63179 as document no. 15-33995)