Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63845
Short Caption:MAKI (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):30904, 66144, 67717, 67800, 69049, 78260, 78260-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR940345Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/21/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-24716
09/25/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP13-MG/MD/NS.13-28647
10/22/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-31783
10/22/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
11/14/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 5, 2013.13-31783