Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63896
Short Caption:BROWN VS. EDDIE WORLDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV34229Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:09/04/2013 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/22/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
08/28/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-25520
08/28/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-25522
08/28/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.13-25524
08/30/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Daniel Marks. Check No. 16339.
09/04/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian.13-26113
09/17/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Case Appeal Statement.13-27397
09/18/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-27600
09/26/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for Friday, November 15, 2013 at 9:30 a.m.13-28863
11/18/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.13-34710
11/26/2013Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.13-35699
12/10/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/08/13. To Court Reporter: Susie Rowe.13-37218
02/07/2014MotionFiled Stipulation Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appelant's Opening Brief and Appendix14-04037
02/07/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief & Appendix Due Date March 26, 2014.14-04044
03/21/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-09057
03/21/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.14-09058
04/23/2014MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief.14-13118
06/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Late Answering Brief. Respondents: 5 days to file and serve their answering brief.14-18019
06/10/2014BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.14-18822
06/13/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief.14-19486
06/13/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: August 11, 2014.14-19528
08/08/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.14-26002
08/13/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-02447
04/16/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. EN BANC15-11365
04/21/2015MotionFiled Motion Respondents' Bill of Costs15-12146
05/11/2015RemittiturIssued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $54.43.15-14326
05/11/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $54.43.15-14336
05/11/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/19/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2015.15-14336