Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63960
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF BLACKCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65983
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P074745Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/12/2013 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/22/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/06/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
09/06/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-26401
09/06/2013Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Robert Duane Frizell.
09/06/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.13-26412
09/10/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.13-26687
09/11/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential civil cover sheet.
09/12/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel.13-27013
09/26/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-28788
10/08/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other Settlement Program Early Case Assessment Report. Pre-mediation conference has not been conducted or continued. Status check scheduled for December 5, 2013, at 10:00 a.m.13-30039
12/12/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other Second Settlement Program Early Case Assessment Report. Status check scheduled for February 13, 2013, at 10:00 a.m.13-37658
02/24/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. Third Settlement Program Early Case Assessment Report. Status check has been scheduled for April 10, 2014 at 11:00 a.m.14-05953
05/05/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-14384
05/06/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.14-14572
05/21/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/08/13 and 07/09/13, To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza.14-16650
06/06/2014Transcript RequestFiled First Supplement to Request for Transcript of Proceedings - Supplemental Certification.14-18431
06/10/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/09/13.14-18850
07/07/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Date of Transcript: 2/8/2013.14-21972
07/24/2014MotionFiled Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Extend Briefing Schedule. Nos. 63960/65983.14-24207
08/06/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause, Deferring Ruling on Motion to Consolidate, and Suspending Briefing. Phillip Markowitz as appellant in Docket No. 65983 shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why that appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent William Fink may file any reply within 11 days from the date that the response is served. The preparation of transcripts in the appeal docketed as Docket No. 65983 is suspended. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to conform the caption on this court's docket sheet in Docket No. 65983 to the caption on this order.] Nos. 63960/65983.14-25739
08/21/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/30/2013.14-27570
09/22/2014MotionFiled William Fink's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages - Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 63960/65983.14-31424
09/29/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 65983, Denying Motion to Consolidate, and Reinstating Briefing in Docket No. 63960. "We order the dismissal of the appeal in Docket No. 65983." We deny as moot the parties' motion to consolidate these two appeals. Appellant in Docket No. 63960: 45 days to file the opening brief and appendix. Fn1[Because William Fink's reply to the response to the order to show cause has already been filed, we deny as moot his September 22, 2014, motion for leave to file excess pages.] Nos. 63960/65983.14-32273
11/06/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 20, 2014.14-36735
11/19/2014MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix.14-38122
11/19/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 15, 2014.14-38190
12/16/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-40885
12/16/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.14-40886
01/16/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: January 23, 2015.15-01788
01/22/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief.15-02286
01/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due date: February 23, 2015.15-02369
01/23/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Corrected Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief due date: February 16, 201515-02624
02/17/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-05146
02/24/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record for William Fink.15-05914
02/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk of this court shall remove Callister & Frizell and Jonathan C. Callister and R. Duane Frizell as counsel of record for appellant.15-06309
03/13/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: March 26, 2015.15-07893
03/24/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief.15-08949
03/24/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: April 6, 2015.15-08951
04/07/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-10377
04/07/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.16-02345
02/04/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Vacated and remanded." Before: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Parraguirre, C.J. Majority: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 7. SNP15-RP/MD/MC16-03759
02/29/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-06340
02/29/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 4, 2016.16-06340