Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63980
Short Caption:LOGAN VS. ABECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1100226Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/18/2013 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/13/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing will be forwarded by the District Court.
09/10/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-26731
09/10/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.13-26733
09/10/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-26735
09/11/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.13-26782
09/12/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from William Patterson Cashill. Check No. 016360.
09/16/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.13-27254
09/16/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Declaration in Lieu of Affidavit of Mailing regarding Case Appeal Statement.13-27309
09/18/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg.13-27616
10/01/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals13-29231
10/18/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other: Settlement Program Early Case Assessment Report (Conference Continued-30 days).13-31479
12/17/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other Settlement Program Early Case Assessment Report. Status conference call scheduled for 12/30/13.13-38373
01/13/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-01169
01/22/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.14-02180
02/25/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.14-06062
02/26/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested.14-06394
04/22/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Appellants to File Opening Brief.14-12912
04/22/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief Due date: May 22, 2014.14-12990
05/21/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.14-16590
05/21/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 1.14-16592
05/21/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 2.14-16593
06/20/2014BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.14-20349
07/17/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time (Reply Brief - 10 days).14-23286
07/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's reply brief due: July 28, 201414-23288
07/28/2014BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.14-24591
07/29/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
10/03/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Firm Name Change and Address Change. Prout LeVangie now known as LeVangie Law Group.14-32859
11/13/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Errata.14-37355
02/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-04860
06/04/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 31. NNP15-NS/MG/KP15-17024
06/29/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-19714
06/29/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/10/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 1, 2015.15-19714
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)