Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64053
Short Caption:MENSAH VS. CORVEL CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69384, 69384-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1202280Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/30/2014How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
09/19/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal.13-27989
09/19/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-27993
09/30/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 Cash from Dzidefo Mensah.
09/30/2013Case Status UpdatePilot Program Civil Appeals. Order and documents mailed to proper person appellant. Civil proper person transcript request form due: 15 days. Civil proper person appeal statement due: 40 days.
11/04/2013Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form.13-33103
11/12/2013BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.13-33851
12/30/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Proper Service. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to properly serve the civil proper person appeal statement on counsel for respondent.13-39524
01/08/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of Civil proper person appeal statement.14-00738
01/22/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due on appeal from district court clerk: 15 days.14-02231
01/29/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol. 1.14-02999
01/30/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol. 2.14-03138
01/30/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol. 3.14-03141
01/30/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol. 4.14-03142
01/30/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vol. 5.14-03143
01/30/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
04/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Respondent's Response (20 pages) to Appellant's Civil Pro Se Appeal Statement due: 30 days.15-09997
05/04/2015BriefFiled Respondent CorVel Corporation's Answering Brief 64053 on Dzidefo Mensah (Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement).15-13641
08/06/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before Saitta, Gibbons and Pickering, JJ. Majority: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 6015-23680
08/25/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing.15-25776
08/25/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from John P. Lavery
10/29/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-33108
11/23/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-35838
11/23/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/11/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 30, 2015.15-35838