Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64064
Short Caption:NEVADA DEP'T OF TAXATION VS. KAWAHARA (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/04/2015 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:02/04/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived: State agency.
09/20/2013Order/IncomingFiled Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada and the Honorable Gregg Zive, U.S. District Court Judge.13-28207
10/24/2013MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel. Marc L. Shea, Esq., and Shea & McIntryre, A.P.C., for the Respondents.13-32126
11/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Accepting Certified Questions, Directing Briefing, and Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Appellant: 45 days to file and serve an opening brief. Respondents: 30 days to file and serve an answering brief. Appellant: 20 days to file and serve any reply brief. The parties are further directed to prepare and file a joint appendix containing certified copies of any relevant portion of the record. The appendix shall be filed no later than the date when the opening brief is filed. Mr. Shea shall therefore be allowed to appear in this matter on behalf of respondents. Nevada attorney Richard G. Hill of the Law Offices of Richard G. Hill, Chartered shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Shea in this matter.13-35357
01/03/2014MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Stipulation to Extend the time for Filing the Opening Brief, Pursuant to NRAP 26(b)(2)14-00111
01/03/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix Due Date: February 3, 2014.14-00114
02/04/2014BriefFiled State of Nevada Department of Taxation's Opening Brief.14-03614
02/04/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Part 1.14-03618
02/21/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondents' Brief Pursuant to NRAP 26(b)(2).14-05852
02/21/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend the time to file the answering brief is approved. Due date: April 2, 2014.14-05851
04/02/2014MotionFiled Motion for Ten-Day Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.14-10350
04/14/2014MotionFiled Motion to Augment Record with Documents Filed Under Seal.14-11869
04/21/2014MotionFiled Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Augment Record with Documents Under Seal.14-12725
04/28/2014MotionFiled Reply to Response - Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Augment Record with Documents filed under Seal.14-13650
07/18/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions for Extension of Time and to Augment the Record. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief, provisionally received in this court on April 10, 2014, and the appendix to the answering brief, provisionally received in this court on April 15, 2014. Respondents: 15 days to submit for filing, true and correct copies of the documents filed under seal in the Bankruptcy Court. On receipt of respondens' submission, the clerk of this court shall file the documents under seal. We deny respondents' request to submit a supplemental appendix containing copies of the documents other than copies of the specific documents considered by the Bankruptcy Court.14-23392
07/18/2014BriefFiled Answering Brief.14-23395
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 1.14-23397
07/18/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol 2.14-23402
08/04/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice - Notice of Supplementation of Record (In response to order issued 7/18/14).14-25322
08/04/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Supplementation of Record. (SEALED).
08/15/2014MotionFiled Motion to Enlarge Time (Reply Brief). (DETACHED REPLY BRIEF AND ADDENDUM PER ORDER FILED 8/19/14).14-26982
08/19/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall detach from and file the reply brief and addendum to the reply brief, both of which are attached to appellant's August 15, 2014, motion.14-27296
08/19/2014BriefFiled Nevada Department of Taxation's Reply Brief.14-27301
08/19/2014BriefFiled Nevada Department of Taxation's Addendum to Reply Brief.14-27304
08/19/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/09/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-40026
01/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, February 4, 2015, @ 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-00413
01/21/2015BriefFiled Respondents' Notice of Supplemental Authorities.15-02176
01/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-02199
02/04/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/04/2015OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
06/25/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Questions answered." Fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from the consideration of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 42. EN BANC15-19378
07/06/2015MotionFiled Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements.15-20445
07/10/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Memorandum of Costs.15-20941
07/13/2015MotionFiled Objection to Respondents' Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements.15-21131
07/20/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Withdraw Memoranda of Costs.15-21882
09/03/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-26740
09/03/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publisher's with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 63179/64064/64260/61553/63731/63810 (Letter entered in 63179 as document no. 15-33995)