Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64135
Short Caption:BARRAL (DUSTIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):74288, 74288-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C269095Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/17/2015 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/17/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/03/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-29489
10/03/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 05/28/13, 05/29/13, 05/30/13, 05/31/13 & 07/08/13. Court Reporter: Jill Jacoby. Filed in district court on: 09/27/13.13-29538
10/22/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. 13-31829
11/06/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcripts.13-33417
11/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court recorder Jill Jacoby: Certificate of Delivery due: December 16, 2013.13-33935
12/11/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/28/13, 5/29/13, 5/30/13, 5/31/13, and 7/8/13.13-37497
01/28/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.14-02959
01/28/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: March 3, 2014.14-02967
02/25/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (2nd Request).14-06150
03/06/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 17, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.14-07239
03/18/2014MotionFiled Motion for Permission to Exceed Page Limit.14-08643
03/18/2014MotionFiled Motion for Order for Transmission of Bulky Evidence.14-08644
03/18/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (PAGES 5-13 STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 5/08/14).14-08645
03/18/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2.14-08646
03/18/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3.14-08647
03/18/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4.14-08648
03/28/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Excess Pages and Rejecting Opening Brief. The clerk of this court shall reject the opening brief received via E-Flex on March 18, 2014. Appellant shall have until April 4, 2014, to file and serve an opening brief that complies with NRAP 32(a). To protect the victim's privacy, the opening brief and all other briefs shall refer to the victim only by the victim's first and last initials.14-09843
04/02/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Transmission of an Original Exhibit and Order to Show Cause. The clerk of the district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court State's Exhibit 2 (identified as "CD-Interview/Video") to the clerk of this court. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why the transcript, included as pages 5-13 of the appendix, should not be struck from the appendix.14-10380
04/07/2014MotionFiled Motion for Permission to Exceed Page Limit.14-10860
04/16/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on April 7, 2014. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the answering brief.14-12308
04/16/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-12309
05/08/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Striking Document from Appellant's Appendix. We direct the clerk of this court to strike pages 5-13 of the appendix filed in this court on March 18, 2014.14-14863
05/16/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.14-15998
05/16/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 16, 2014.14-16091
06/16/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-19810
07/16/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-23165
07/16/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-02969
03/03/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, April 17, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-06671
04/03/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-10055
04/17/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel. SNP15-RP/MD/MC.
07/23/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Parraguirre/Douglas. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. SNP15-RP/MD/MC15-22296
08/06/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.15-23736
09/25/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-29135
10/05/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.15-30118
12/02/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC.15-36650
12/28/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Original State's Exhibit 2 to District Court Clerk. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER ORDER FILED 2/17/16)15-39726
12/28/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/31/2015MotionFiled Motion to Recall and Stay Issuance of Remittitur.15-40256
01/12/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 30, 2015.15-39726
01/28/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed January 18, 2016 and placed on the docket as Case No. 15-931.16-03055
02/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Recalling Remittitur. The clerk of this court is directed to recall the remittitur issued December 28, 2015. Further, issuance of the remittitur shall be stayed until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings.16-05131
07/06/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.16-21029
07/07/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-21065
07/07/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 12, 2016.16-21065