Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64214
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO A.P.M. AND E.M.M.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64274
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D472749Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/06/2015 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/06/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. (Appellant is represented by the Special Public Defender)
10/15/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Notice re: parental termination expedited filing schedule issued to all counsel.)13-30723
10/17/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes. (SEALED)
10/17/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court: (Confidential Coversheet)
10/22/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/10/13, 4/13/13, 5/06/13, 5/31/13, 6/07/13 and 7/02/13. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub.13-31801
11/01/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-32870
11/26/2013TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/10/13; 5/6/13; 5/31/13; 6/7/13; and 7/2/13.13-35763
01/13/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 22, 2014.14-01172
01/22/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-02183
01/23/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 1.14-02325
01/23/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 2.14-02326
01/23/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 3.14-02327
01/23/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 4.14-02329
01/23/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 5.14-02336
01/23/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 6.14-02337
01/23/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 7.14-02338
02/20/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Answering Briefs (Arli Patrick Ma, Jr. & Erik Matthew Ma, and the State of Nevada Department of Family Services). Due Date: 15 days.14-05561
03/06/2014MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Consolidate Appeals and for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (64214/64274)14-07253
03/12/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder to Ron Cordes. Esq.'s Motion to Consolidate Appeals and for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.14-08042
04/10/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Setting Revised Briefing Schedule. Appellant Abigail L. M.'s opening brief in Docket No. 64274 is due on or before May 21, 2014. Respondents shall have 20 days from the date that her opening brief is served to file and serve an answering brief addressing both appellant's opening briefs. Thereafter, appellants shall have ten days from the date that the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply briefs.14-11527
05/14/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant Abigail Ma's Opening Brief and Serve the Supplement Joint Appendix.14-15709
05/15/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: June 20, 2014. Nos. 64214/64274.14-15931
06/19/2014BriefFiled Appellant Abigail Ma's Opening Brief. Nos. 64214/64274. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 7/28/14).
06/25/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Suggestion of Death. Nos. 64214/64274.14-20853
07/09/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief for Minors Arli Patrick Ma and Erik Matthew Ma. Nos. 64214/64274.14-22241
07/09/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (State of Nevada Department of Family Services)14-22346
07/10/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder to Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 64214/64274. (For Minors Arli Patrick Ma and Erik Matthew Ma.)14-22366
07/22/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64214/6427414-23818
07/23/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/28/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 64274. We dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 64274. The clerk of this court shall strike the opening brief filed by Abigail L.M. on June 19, 2014. In respondents' answering briefs, we will only consider the arguments relevant to the remaining appellant, Arli P.M. Nos. 64214/64274.14-24582
11/04/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-36415
11/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, January 6, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-37884
12/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-42020
01/06/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/10/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Pickering. Douglas, J., with whom Cherry, J., agrees, dissenting. Saitta, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 66. EN BANC15-27323
09/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: October 5, 2015.15-29269
10/06/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.15-30276
10/22/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Douglas, J., with whom Cherry, J., agrees, dissenting. Saitta, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part.15-32281
11/17/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-35077
11/17/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 20, 2015.15-35077
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)