Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64260
Short Caption:ALPER VS. DIST. CT. (PLISE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):56650, 64207, 69608
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A591861Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/07/2015 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/07/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/22/2013Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Edward J. Hanigan.
10/22/2013Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or in the Alternative Writ of Mandamus.13-31736
10/22/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ -Petitioners' Appendix.13-31749
01/09/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.14-00859
02/06/2014Petition/WritFiled Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-03986
02/06/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-03987
02/18/2014Petition/WritFiled Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.14-05272
10/06/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-33052
10/15/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 3:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-34299
10/21/2014MotionFiled Motion to Reset Hearing Date.14-35089
10/22/2014MotionFiled Reply to Motion to Reset Hearing Date.14-35220
10/23/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Continuting Oral Argument. The oral argument presently scheduled for December 9, 2014, at 3:30 p.m. is hereby vacated. This matter will be scheduled for argument before the court on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-35371
11/17/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, January 7, 2015, at 1:0 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-37888
12/23/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-42024
01/07/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
06/25/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ instructing the district court to vacate its contempt order and conduct further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 43. EN BANC15-19379
06/25/2015WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Edward J. Hanigan for service upon Judge Charles M. McGee.15-19487
07/13/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Acknowledgment Of Service (Original Writ of Prohibition)15-21257
07/13/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing (Original Writ of Prohibition)15-21258
07/20/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-21826
07/20/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/20/2015WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Charles M. McGee on July 8th, 2015.15-21905
11/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued ssued Letter to Publisher's with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 63179/64064/64260/61553/63731/63810 (Letter entered in 63179 as document no. 15-33995)