Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64274
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO A.P.M. AND E.M.M.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64214
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D472749Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/24/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
10/24/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal.13-32131
10/24/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-32133
10/29/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes. (SEALED)
10/29/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Coversheet.
12/03/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has neither paid the filing fee nor responded to this court's notice. Accordingly, cause appearing, "this appeal is hereby dismissed."13-36260
12/17/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Valarie I Fujii, Law Office. Check No. 0001.
12/17/2013Filing FeeRehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Valarie I. Fujii, Law Office. Check No. 0001.
12/17/2013Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.13-38368
02/20/2014Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Rehearing. This appeal is reinstated, and no filing fee is due. Fn1[The clerk of this court shall return the fees provisionally submitted by appellant.]14-05551
02/20/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Valarie I. Fujii, regarding the refund of the filing fee and rehearing fee.14-05565
02/20/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Docketing Statement due: 20 days. Opening brief due: 90 days.14-05585
03/04/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/10/13, 4/11/13, 5/01/13, 5/06/13, 5/31/13, 6/07/13, and 7/02/13 To Court Reporter: Steven Grierson.14-07012
03/06/2014MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Appeals and for Extension of Time To File Answering Brief. (64274/64214)14-07252
03/11/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-07730
03/12/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder to Ron Cordes, Esq.'s motion to Consolidate Appeals and for Extenstion fo Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 64214/64274.14-08033
04/10/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Setting Revised Briefing Schedule. Appellant Abigail L. M.'s opening brief in Docket No. 64274 is due on or before May 21, 2014. Respondents shall have 20 days from the date that her opening brief is served to file and serve an answering brief addressing both appellant's opening briefs. Thereafter, appellants shall have ten days from the date that the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply briefs.14-11527
05/14/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant Abigail Ma's Opening Brief and Serve the Supplement Joint Appendix.14-15709
05/15/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: June 20, 2014. Nos. 64214/64274.14-15931
06/19/2014BriefFiled Appellant Abigail Ma's Opening Brief. Nos. 64214/64274. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 7/28/14).
06/25/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Suggestion of Death. Nos. 64214/64274.14-20853
07/09/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief for Minors Arli Patrick Ma and Erik Matthew Ma. Nos. 64214/64274.14-22241
07/09/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (State of Nevada Department of Family Services)14-22346
07/10/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder to Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 64214/64274. (For Minors Arli Patrick Ma and Erik Matthew Ma.)14-22366
07/22/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64214/6427414-23818
07/23/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/28/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 64274. "We dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 64274." The clerk of this court shall strike the opening brief filed by Abigail L.M. on June 19, 2014. In respondents' answering briefs, we will only consider the arguments relevant to the remaining appellant, Arli P.M. Nos. 64214/64274. NNP14-KP/RP/NS.14-24583
08/25/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-27997
08/25/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
09/09/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 28, 2014.14-27997