Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64287
Short Caption:SHARPE (PHILLIP) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR0007910Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/13/2015 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/13/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. Criminal.
10/28/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-32285
11/18/2013Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.13-34726
11/19/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.13-34826
02/21/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until March 4, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.14-05816
02/27/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.14-06448
03/03/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Moreen Scully, Deputy District Attorney for the Respondent.14-06839
03/06/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until April 3, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.14-07194
04/03/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief - NO.2.14-10623
04/16/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on April 14, 2014. Answering Brief due: 30 days.14-12312
04/16/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-12313
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 1.14-12314
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 2.14-12315
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 3.14-12316
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 4.14-12317
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 5.14-12318
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 6.14-12319
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 7.14-12320
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 8.14-12321
04/16/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 9.14-12322
05/08/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend time to Response (Answering Brief).14-14817
05/08/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 16, 2014.14-14867
06/12/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-19242
06/12/2014AppendixFiled Respondents Appendix Volume 1 Part 1.14-19305
06/13/2014AppendixFiled Respondents Appendix Vol 1 Pt 2.14-19507
06/13/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. 2.14-19509
06/13/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. 3.14-19510
07/08/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent's motion to seal transcript due: 20 days.14-22148
07/09/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response (Reply Brief).14-22201
07/09/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: July 31, 2014.14-22333
07/21/2014MotionFiled Motion to Unseal Transcript.14-23555
07/21/2014MotionFiled Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Unseal Transcript.14-23622
07/31/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief.14-25086
07/31/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the transcript received on June 16, 2014. Respondent: 11 days to file a supplemental appendix containing the transcript.14-25113
08/04/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vols. III and IV. (In response to order entered on 7/31/2014).14-25393
08/08/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 29, 2014, to file and serve the reply brief.14-26059
08/29/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-28680
08/29/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/09/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1.14-29835
09/09/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2.14-29836
09/09/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3.14-29837
09/09/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4.14-29838
09/09/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5.14-29839
09/09/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6.14-29840
09/09/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7.14-29841
09/09/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8.14-29842
09/09/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9.14-29843
11/25/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-38898
12/01/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, January 13, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.14-39056
12/31/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-42525
01/13/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP15-NS/MG/KP.
01/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Inviting Participation by Amicus Curiae. The Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice and the Nevada District Attorneys Association are invited to participate as amicus curiae in this proceeding and to file amicus briefs. Should these organizations choose to participate, they shall file and serve amicus briefs within 30 days from the date of this order.15-01845
02/17/2015BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Nevada District Attorneys Association.15-05074
02/18/2015BriefFiled Amicus Brief of Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice as Amicus Curiae Upon Invitation of the Court.15-05233
06/04/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Saitta/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 32. NNP15-NS/MG/KP15-17025
06/22/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.15-19060
06/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days.15-19418
07/09/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to the Petition for Rehearing due: July 17, 2015.15-20876
07/17/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing.15-21696
07/31/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-23151
08/10/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for en banc reconsideration due: August 21, 2015.15-24034
08/21/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.15-25371
09/03/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC15-26832
09/28/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-29286
09/28/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/07/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 30, 2015.15-29286
10/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913)