The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64349
Short Caption:GOLDEN RD. MOTOR INN, INC. VS. MEI-GSR HOLDINGS LLC C/W 64452/65497Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Consolidated:64349*, 64452, 65497Related Case(s):64452, 65497
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1201171Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:11/14/2013 / Georgeson, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/03/2015 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/03/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/06/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
11/06/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-33331
11/06/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-33334
11/07/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd. Check no. 51473.
11/12/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.13-33647
11/12/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Minutes.13-33657
11/13/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Robert Eisenberg appearing on behalf of Appellants).13-33891
11/14/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James Georgeson.13-34134
11/20/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Mark Wray. Check no. 10593. (Cross-Appeal) (Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Islam).
11/20/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Islam).13-34896
11/27/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Appellant/Cross-Respondent).13-35881
12/05/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement (Respondent/Cross-Appellant Sumona Islam).13-36535
12/10/2013Docketing StatementFiled Respondent MEI-GSR Holdings LLC Response to Appellant Golden Road Motor Inns Docketing Statement.13-37222
12/10/2013Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 31, 2014. Nos. 64349/64452.13-37275
02/03/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 64349/6445214-03458
04/02/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants/cross-respondents (appellants) and respondent/cross-appellant (cross-appellant) shall each have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Further, appellants shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix on appeal. Cross-appellant shall have 30 days from service of appellants' opening brief to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Respondents shall also have 30 days from service of appellants' opening brief to file and serve their answering brief on appeal. Fn2 [Upon completion of briefing, this appeal may be consolidated for purposes of disposition with the related appeal in Docket No. 64452. If the parties believe these matters should be consolidated for all appellate purposes, they may file an appropriate stipulation or motion. See NRAP 3(b)(2).]14-10425
04/17/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/12/13; 7/16/13; and 7/18/13. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent)14-12455
05/07/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Case Appeal Statement.14-14789
05/20/2014Docketing StatementFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Amended Docketing Statement.14-16345
05/27/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-17018
06/20/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Appeals, Setting Briefing Schedule, and Directing the Filing of Documents. Appellant Alantis Casino Resort Spa's Opening Briefs (2 separate opening briefs) due: July 31, 2014. Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Islam and Grand Sierra Resort combined Answering/Opening Briefs (2 briefs, 1 each cross-appellant) due: 30 days after service of opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 28.1(f)(1), with Atlantic Casino Resort Spa acting as the appellant and Islam and Grand Sierra Resort acting as cross-appellants. Islam's transcript request form in Docket No. 64349 due: 15 days. Atlantis Casino Resort Spa's transcript request form in Docket No. 65497 due: 15 days. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-20420
06/26/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-21025
06/27/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested (Docket No. 65497 - Respondent/Cross-Appellant Golden Road Motor Road Inn, Inc. dba Atlantis Casino Resort Spa). Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-21201
07/31/2014MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension of Time to File Opening Briefs. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-24990
08/12/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Atlantis Casino Resort Spa's Opening Briefs due: September 2, 2014. Respondents/cross-appellants Sumona Islam and Grand Sierra Resort's combined answering/opening briefs due: 60 days from service of opening briefs. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-26445
09/02/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief Regarding Sumona Islam (Appellant/Cross-Respondent). Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-28932
09/02/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief Regarding Grand Sierra Resort (Appellant/Cross-Respondent). Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-28933
09/02/2014MotionFiled Motion To Maintain Treatment of Portions of Appendix As Sealed (Appellant/Cross-Respondent). Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-28934
09/02/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume I. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-28935
09/02/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume II. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-28936
09/03/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume III. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-28948
09/03/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VII. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-28949
09/03/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VIII. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-28950
09/03/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume XI. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-28951
09/03/2014Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of Stipulated Protective Order filed in district court on 08/27/14.14-29028
10/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplement to Motion to File under Seal. Appellant/cross-respondent Golden Road Motor Inn, LLC's supplement to motion due: 11 days. We defer ruling on the motion to seal pending receipt and consideration of the supplement. fn1[The clerk of this court shall revise the caption for Docket Nos. 64349/64452 to conform to the caption on this order.] Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-32943
10/13/2014Other Incoming DocumentFiled Supplement to Motion to Seal. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-33878
10/13/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening and Answering Briefs. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-33968
10/23/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening and Answering Briefs. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-35374
11/07/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal and Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall therefore file under seal (appendix) pages 815-817 of Volume 4, pages 951-1042 of Volume 5, pages 1235-1260 of Volume 6, pages 1845-1870 and 1956-1981 of Volume 9, pages 2055-2080 and 2216-2241 of Volume 10, pages 2437-4263 of Volumes 12-20, and pages 4264-6052 of Volumes 21-28, which were provisionally received in this court on September 3, 2014. The clerk of this court shall also file the remaining pages of these volumes, which were also provisionally received on that same day. MEI-GSR Holdings and Sumona Islam shall therefore each have until December 5, 2014, to file and serve their combined answering and opening briefs. And Golden Road Motor Inn shall have until January 31, 2015, to file and serve its combined reply and answering briefs. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-36897
11/07/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. IV. (Pages 815-817 filed under seal per order 11/7/14). Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-36943
11/07/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. V. (Pages 951-1042 filed under seal per order 11/07/2014). Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-36946
11/07/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. VI. (Pages 1235-1260 filed under seal per order 11/7/14). Nos. 64349/64452/65497.14-36948
11/07/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. IX. (Pages 1845-1870 and 1956-1981 filed under seal per order 11/07/2014). Nos. 64649/64452/65497.14-36949
11/07/2014AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. X. (Pages 2055-2080 and 2216-2241 filed under seal per order 11/07/2014). Nos. 64649/64452/65497.14-36950
11/07/2014AppendixFiled - SEALED - Joint Appendix - pages 815-817 of Volume 4, pages 951-1042 of Volume 5, pages 1235-1260 of Volume 6, pages 1845-1870 and 1956-1981 of Volume 9, pages 2055-2080 and 2216-2241 of Volume 10, and Volumes 12-28. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 11/07/2014). Nos. 64349/64452/65497.
12/05/2014BriefFiled GSR's Combined Answering Brief/Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal.14-39721
12/09/2014BriefFiled Respondent and Cross Appellant Islam's Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief. Nos. 64649/64452/6549714-39945
01/28/2015MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension of Time to File Answering and Reply Briefs.Nos. 64649/64452/65497.15-03074
02/09/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Golden Road Motor Inn, Inc. combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on cross-appeal due: March 2, 2015. MEI-GSR Holdings Reply Brief on cross-appeal due: 60 days. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.15-04145
03/03/2015BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent Reply/Answering Brief (Respondent's Answering Brief and Appellant's Reply Brief Regarding Sumona Islam).15-06569
03/03/2015BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent Reply/Answering Brief (Respondent's Answering Brief and Appellant's Reply Brief Regarding The Grand Sierra Resort).15-06570
04/02/2015BriefFiled Respondent and Cross-Appellant Islam's Reply Brief.15-09944
04/16/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Appellant's Opening Brief Regarding Grand Sierra Resort.(Appellant/Cross-Respondent)15-11472
04/16/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/03/2015MotionFiled Respondent/Cross Appellant's Motion for Leave to File An Untimely Reply. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.15-16953
06/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on May 7, 2015. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.15-17379
06/08/2015BriefFiled GSR's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal.15-17381
07/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.15-22779
07/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, September 2, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-23088
08/07/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.15-23939
08/13/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Cause appearing, the stipulation to continue oral argument of this matter is approved. The oral argument presently scheduled for September 2, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. is vacated. This matter is scheduled for oral argument before the en banc court on November 3, 2015, at 10;00 a.m., in Carson City. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.15-24422
10/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 3, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-30021
10/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-32046
11/03/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/02/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address (Robert Dotson is now with Dotson Law). Nos. 64349/64452/65497.16-03547
02/11/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys, Robert A. Dotson of Dotson Law in place and stead of Laxalt & Nomura, LTD. for Appellant Golden Road Motor Inn, Inc. d/b/a Atlantis Casino Resort Spa. Nos. 64349/64452/65497.16-04484
07/21/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. Hardesty, J. with whom Parraguirre, C.J., and Pickering, J., agree, dissenting in part. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 49. EN BANC Nos. 64349/64452/6549716-22640
08/15/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-25208
08/15/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. No.s 64349/64452/65497.
08/26/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2016.16-25208
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/69169 (Filed in docket no. 67656 document no. 16-34632)