Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64381
Short Caption:JONES, M.D. VS. STATE, BD. OF MEDICAL EXAMINERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1300879Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Venue
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/17/2014How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/13/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
11/13/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-33976
11/13/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-33978
11/15/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:13-34427
11/21/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hafter Law. Check no. 005070.
03/05/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This order will serve to clarify that this appeal is exempt from the settlement program. It appears that this is an appeal from an order denying appellant's motion to change venue. Record on Appeal due from the district court clerk 30 days. No briefing required unless ordered by this court. Docketing statement due: 20 days.14-07049
03/11/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-07647
04/17/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vol. 1.14-12450
04/17/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 2.14-12452
04/17/2014Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 3.14-12453
04/17/2014Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
06/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Full Briefing. Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. Opening Brief due: 30 days.14-19526
07/10/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-22418
07/30/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-24940
07/31/2014AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.14-24959
08/12/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.14-26450
08/13/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested.14-26516
08/27/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-28330
08/27/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/23/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners Substitution of Counsel, Erin L. Albright, Esq., in place and stead of Bradley O. Van Ry, Esq. as attorney of record.14-31569
02/05/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 4. SNP1415-03809
03/02/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-06503
03/02/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/17/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 6, 2015.15-06503