Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64427
Short Caption:FORTUNET, INC. VS. PLAYBOOK PUBL'G, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65632, 69747, 72930
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A645734Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/18/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
11/18/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-34718
11/20/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Watson Rounds. Check No. 202.
12/10/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketng Statement Civil Appeals.13-37174
12/13/2013MotionFiled Respondents Himelfarb Parties' Motions for (1) Summary Affirmance, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss with Prejudice; and (2) Sanctions Pursuant to NRAP 38.13-37776
12/24/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified Copies of Order & Notice of Entry of Order to Satisfy Deficiency Notice.13-39121
12/24/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel13-39147
12/24/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Tami D. Cowden, Esq. of the law firm of Greenberg Traurig , LLP appearing on behalf of Appellants).13-39149
12/26/2013Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until January 2, 2014, to file and serve an opposition to respondent's motion for summary affirmance, or in the alternative, to dismiss with prejudice and sanctions pursuant to NRAP 38.13-39265
01/02/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.14-00072
01/06/2014MotionFiled Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Opposition to Himelfarb Parties' Motion for 1) Summary Affirmance or in the Alternative, to Dismiss With Prejudice, and 2) Sanctions Pursuant to NRAP 38.14-00230
01/10/2014Transcript RequestFiled Appellants' Certification of Order and Receipt of Transcripts.14-01066
01/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Opposition with Excess Pages. Appellant's motion for leave to file a 20-page opposition to respondents' motion for summary affirmance or dismissal, and sanctions, is granted. Appellant shall have five days from the date of this order to file and serve the opposition.14-02583
02/03/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Himelfarb Parties' Motion for 1) Summary Affirmance or in the Alternative, to Dismiss with Prejudice, and 2) Sanctions Pursuant to NRAP 38 and Countermotion to Dismiss Appeal without Prejudice.14-03376
02/05/2014MotionFiled Respondents Himelfarb's Reply in Support of Motions for Summary Affirmance and Sanctions and Response to Appellant's Countermotion for Dismissal Without Prejudice.14-03737
02/11/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdawal by Watson Rounds as Attorney for Appellant FortuNet, Inc.14-04339
03/17/2014Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[Pursuant to Watson Rounde' February 11, 2014, notice of withdrawal as counsel for appellant, which withdrawal was consented to by appellant, the clerk of this court shall remove Watson Rounds as appellant's counsel in this appeal. Appellant continues to represented in this appeal by Greenberg Traurig.] SNP14-JH/MD/MC14-08599
04/11/2014RemittiturIssued Remittitur.14-11707
04/11/2014Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/24/2014RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 15, 2014.14-11707