Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64473
Short Caption:NEV. DEPT. OF CORR. VS. YORK CLAIMS SERV'S, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 13OC000651BClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:11/27/2013 / Georgeson, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/11/2015 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/11/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/22/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
11/22/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)13-35360
11/22/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.13-35364
11/26/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.13-35663
11/27/2013Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James Georgeson13-35894
11/27/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.13-35900
12/05/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Nevada Department of Corrections' Case Appeal Statement.13-36491
12/05/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy Docket Entries.13-36492
12/11/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.13-37460
12/13/2013Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (State of Nevada Risk Management).13-37968
12/16/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (Second NOA) (Nev. Risk Management's Joinder)13-38089
12/19/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.13-38723
12/19/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.13-38724
01/15/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: ECAR. Issued Notice to Settlement Judge James Georgeson to file Early Case Assessment Report.14-01543
01/24/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 04/02/14 @ 10 am.14-02635
04/07/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.14-10843
04/11/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.14-11726
04/21/2014Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.14-12858
04/23/2014Other Incoming DocumentFiled District Court Docket Sheet.14-13041
04/24/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.14-13220
05/01/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.14-14060
05/05/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.14-14346
05/14/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy District Court Docket Entries.14-15733
05/15/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.14-15935
05/21/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.14-16626
05/30/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.14-17656
06/11/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries14-19141
06/19/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.14-20255
06/26/2014MotionFiled Motion for Temporary Stay Pending Appeal.14-21109
06/27/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant Nevada Department of Corrections' Notice of Joinder for Temporary Stay.14-21123
07/09/2014MotionFiled Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Filing of Opposition to Nevada Risk Management's Motion for Temporary Stay Pending Appeal.14-22191
07/10/2014BriefFiled Appellant Risk Management's Opening Brief.14-22391
07/10/2014BriefFiled Appellant Nevada Department of Corrections' Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 9/24/2014).
07/10/2014MotionFiled Appellant NDOC's Motion to Seal Certain Volumes of Its Appellant's Appendix.14-22476
07/10/2014AppendixFiled Appellant NDOC's Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.14-22482
07/10/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Appellant NDOC's Appendix Vols. 6 and 7.14-22483
07/10/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Appellant NDOC's Appendix Vol. 8.14-22484
07/23/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit, Granting Stay, and Granting Motion to Seal. We direct the clerk of this court to file the opposition, received on July 9, 2014, and the reply received on July 15, 2014. We grant Nevada Risk Management's motion and stay the district court's order pending this court's resolution of this appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to file under seal volumes 3, 4, and 5 of appellant's appendix received on July 10, 2014.14-24028
07/23/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Nevada Risk Management's Motion for Temporary Stay Pending Appeal.14-24031
07/23/2014MotionFiled Nevada Risk Management's Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Stay Pending Appeal.14-24032
07/23/2014AppendixFiled --SEALED--Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Appellant NDOC Appendix, Vols. 3, 4, and 5.
07/25/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.14-24347
08/12/2014BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.14-26322
09/10/2014BriefFiled Appellant Nevada Department of Corrections' Reply Brief.14-29991
09/10/2014BriefFiled Appellant, Risk Management's, Reply Brief.14-30004
09/10/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/10/2014MotionFiled Motion - Notice of Errata; Motion for Leave of Court to File Replacement Opening Brief With Corrections. (DETACHED REPLACEMENT OPENING BRIEF AND FILED PER ORDER 9/24/2014).14-30010
09/18/2014MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Leave of Court to File Replacement Opening Brief With Corrections.14-30940
09/19/2014MotionFiled Respondents' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to File Replacement Brief or, Alternatively, Withdrawal of the Motion if York Would be Allowed to Improperly File a "Rebutal" Brief. (Title Should read Appellant's Reply Brief...)14-31232
09/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Corrected Opening Brief. We deny as unnecessary respndents' request to file a replacement brief. The clerk of this court shall strike NDOC's opening brief filed on July 10, 2014, and detach and file the replacement opening brief that is attached to NDOC's September 10, 2014, motion. Briefing in this appeal is deemed completed.14-31715
09/24/2014BriefFiled Appellant Nevada Department of Corrections' Opening Brief. (DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON SEPTEMBER 10, 2014, AND FILED PER ORDER 9/24/2014).14-31720
01/28/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-02976
02/04/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Wednesday, March 11, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-03787
02/12/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Anjali D. Webster Gordon Silver/Reno as counsel for York Claims Services, Inc. and Washworks Rainbow, LLC.)15-04747
02/27/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-06334
03/11/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP15-NS/KP/MG.
05/07/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before: Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Saitta/Pickering.131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 25. NNP15-NS/MG/KP15-13955
05/13/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for Rehearing due: June 02, 2015.15-14638
06/02/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Petition for Rehearing.15-16906
06/02/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from John P. Desmond
06/04/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: 15 days.15-17111
06/18/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Nevada Department of Corrections' Response to Petition for Rehearing.15-18707
06/18/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant, Nevada Risk Management's Response to Petition for Rehearing.15-18747
07/31/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-23146
08/05/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: August 21, 2015.15-23645
08/20/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Law Firm Affiliation (Anjali Webster and John Desmond have changed from Gordon Silver to Dickinson Wright).15-25272
08/21/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.15-25407
09/03/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC15-26828
09/10/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.15-27364
09/28/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-29249
09/28/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/30/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 30, 2015.15-29249