Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64484
Short Caption:STATE FARM MUTUAL VS. HANSEN (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. District Court
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/05/2015 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/05/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee due.
11/25/2013Order/IncomingFiled Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada and the Honorable Miranda M. Du, U.S. District Court Judge.13-35525
01/06/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Submission of Filing Fee. Appellant and respondent shall each tender to the clerk of this court, within 11 days from the date of this order, the sum of $125, representing half of the filing fee.14-00267
01/13/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $125.00 on behalf of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP. Check No. 13111. (American Legal Investigation Services, Nevada)
01/21/2014Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $125.00 from Bowen Law Offices. Check No. 2727.
04/23/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding NRAP 5 Certification Order. We invite the Honorable Miranda M. Du, United States District Court Judge for the District of Nevada, to transmit to this court within 30 days of the date of this order a copy of the summary judgment order referenced in the certification order. We defer ruling on whether this court will accept the certified questions pending receipt and consideration of the summary judgment order.14-13010
05/05/2014Order/IncomingFiled Summary Judgment Order from US District Court Judge Miranda M. Du.14-14339
06/20/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Accepting Certified Questions and Directing Briefing. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 45 days. Answering Brief due: 30 days from service of OB. Reply Brief due: 20 days from service of AB.14-20326
08/01/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Briefing Schedule.14-25203
08/01/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: September 3, 2014.14-25280
09/03/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I.14-29082
09/03/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II.14-29083
09/03/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III.14-29085
09/03/2014AppendixFiled Appeallant's Appendix Volume IV.14-29086
09/03/2014AppendixFiled Appeallant's Appendix Volume V.14-29087
09/03/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-29089
09/04/2014Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure.14-29184
09/12/2014MotionFiled Amici Curiae, American Insurance Association's and the National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies', and Property Casualty Insurers Association of America's Motion for Leave to File Amici Brief. (DETACHED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 9/19/14).14-30357
09/12/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Amici Curiae, American Insurance Association's and the National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies', and Property Casualty Insurers Association of America's NRAP Rule 26.1 Disclosure14-30358
09/19/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The clerk of this court shall detach and file the proposed amicus brief, which is attached to the September 12, 2014, motion.14-31204
09/19/2014BriefFiled Amici Curiae Brief (American Insurance Association, National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies, and Property Casualty Insurers Association of America).14-31206
09/30/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Respondent's Answering Brief.14-32569
09/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief Due Date: November 3, 2014.14-32577
11/03/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Respondent's Answering Brief.14-36178
11/17/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Answering Brief due: 5 days. Reply Brief due: 20 days thereafter.14-37843
11/17/2014MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.14-37911
11/25/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-38726
11/25/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Respondent's Appendix Vol. 114-38866
11/25/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Respondent's Appendix Vol. 214-38867
11/25/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Respondent's Appendix Vol. 314-38869
11/25/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Respondent's Appendix Vol. 414-38871
11/26/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Respondent's Appendix Vol. 5.14-38974
11/26/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Respondent's Appendix Vol. 6.14-38975
12/09/2014MotionFiled Amici Curiae Centex Homes, Centex Real Estate Corporation and the Southern Nevada Home Builders Association's Motion for Leave to file Amicus Brief in Support of Respondent Stephen Tanner Hansen (Amicus Brief is attached). (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED PER ORDER 1/12/2015).14-39966
12/09/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Amici Curiae Centex Homes, et al. NRAP 26.1 Disclosure.14-39984
12/12/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Reply Brief - 14 days.14-40485
12/12/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: December 29, 2014.14-40488
12/30/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-42362
12/31/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to File Amicus Brief. The clerk of this court shall detach and file the proposed amicus brief, which is attached to the December 9, 2014, motion.15-01159
01/12/2015BriefFiled Amicus Brief (Centex Homes, Centex Real Estate Corporation, and the Southern Nevada Home Builders Association). (DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON 12/9/14 AND FILED PER ORDER 1/12/15).15-01170
03/27/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-09379
03/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument scheduled for Tuesday, May 5, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-09570
04/17/2015MotionFiled Motion to Participate in Oral Argument.15-11505
04/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-11776
04/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Pursuant to NRAP 29(h), permission for amicus curiae to participate at oral argument will only be granted for extraordinary reasons. This court has determined that amicus curiae in this matter have failed to demonstrate extraordinary reasons. Accordingly, the motion is denied.15-12116
05/05/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before En Banc Court.
05/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Recusal.15-14696
05/13/2015OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
09/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Questions answered." Fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from the consideration of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 74. EN BANC15-28866
10/19/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-31724
10/19/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.)