The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64515
Short Caption:CASTANEDA (ANTHONY) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C272657Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/07/2015 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/07/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
12/02/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)13-36109
12/13/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Entry of Written Judgment and Order Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days.13-37847
12/30/2013Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Probation Agreement and Rules, Order Admitting Defendant to Probation and Fixing the Terms Thereof filed in district court on 12/26/13.13-39509
12/31/2013Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction (Plea of Guilty) filed in district court on 12/31/13.13-39693
01/03/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's counsel shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix.14-00097
01/07/2014TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/8/13 thru 7/16/13 and 10/14/13. Court Reporter: Lara Corcoran.14-00484
01/07/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/21/11.14-00504
01/10/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/2/11 (Beverly Sigurnik), 11/21/11, 1/25/12, 2/01/12, 11/19/12, 1/28/13, 2/5/13, 2/6/13, 2/11/13, 4/22/13, 5/01/13, 5/20/13, 10/30/13 (Lara Corcoran), 11/23/11 (Debbie Winn), 7/1/13 (Sandra Pruchnic) & 10/28/13 (Patti Slattery). Court Reporter: Beverly Sigurnik, Lara Corcoran, Debbie Winn, Sandra Pruchnic & Patti Slattery. Filed in district court on: 1/06/14.14-00936
02/03/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Lara Cocoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: Transcripts requested: 11/21/11, 1/25/12, 2/01/12, 11/19/12, 1/28/13, 2/5/13, 2/6/13, 2/11/13, 4/22/13, 5/01/13, 5/20/13, 7/01/13 10/28/13, 10/30/13 and 11/23/11.14-03402
02/12/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time, Alternatively Motion for Full Briefing.14-04531
02/18/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Full Briefing. Counsel for the parties shall fully brief the issues as provided in NRAP 28, 28.2, 30, 31, and 32. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.14-05157
05/19/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File OB.14-16282
05/19/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: June 2, 2014.14-16303
06/03/2014MotionFiled Motion Requesting Transmittal of An Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d).14-17904
06/03/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appendix Vol I .14-17905
06/03/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appendix Vol II.14-17906
06/03/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appendix Vol III.14-17908
06/03/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appendix Vol IV.14-17909
06/03/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appendix Vol V.14-17910
06/03/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appendix Vol VI.14-17911
06/03/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appendix Vol VII.14-17912
06/03/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief -Appendix Vol VIII.14-17913
06/03/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-17918
06/09/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion fo Transmission of Exhibit. District court clerk: 20 days to transmit the original exhibit marked as State's Exhibit 79.14-18669
07/03/2014MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time - First Request (Answering Brief - 45 days).14-21812
07/15/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: August 18, 2014.14-23020
08/21/2014MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (Second Request - Answering Brief).14-27670
09/11/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: October 2, 2014.14-30199
10/03/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-32860
11/03/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief.14-36322
11/03/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Repy Brief Due Date: December 3, 2014.14-36351
12/03/2014BriefFiled Reply Brief.14-39328
12/03/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-05966
02/25/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Tuesday, April 7, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-05997
03/23/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-08729
04/07/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
04/08/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Points and Authorities and Correction of the Record.15-10662
04/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We direct the clerk of this court to file the "Supplemental Points and Authorities and Correction of the Record" received on April 8, 2015. Respondent shall have 11 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response, not to exceed 10 pages. No reply shall be filed.15-11645
04/17/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Supplemental Points and Authorities and Correction of the Record15-11646
04/28/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Points and Authorities15-12817
06/16/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, vacated in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 44. EN BANC16-18839
07/12/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned original State exhibit 79 to District Court Clerk.16-21716
07/12/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/28/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 21, 2016.16-21716
04/27/2017OtherReturned Unfiled Document "Review and Reconsider Decision of Appeal #64515."17-13997