Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 64529
Short Caption:SIMPSON (ORENTHAL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):52166, 52343, 52348, 52399, 53080, 53100, 61136
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C237890Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/24/2014How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/04/2013Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
12/04/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.) - Part 1.13-36305
12/04/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track - Part 2.13-36306
12/06/2013Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/13/13, 5/14/13, 5/15/13, 5/16/13 & 5/17/13. Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. Filed in district court on: 12/02/1313-36705
12/16/2013MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing Due to the Complexity of the Issues and the Inability to Adequately Brief Issues Within the Limits Imposed by NRAP 3C.13-38104
12/20/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion for full briefing. Appellant: 20 days to file the docketing statement; 120 days to file the opening brief and appendix. (Docketing statement form mailed to attorney Patricia Palm).13-38768
01/08/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.14-00709
01/09/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/13/13, 5/14/13, 5/15/13, 5/16/13 & 5/17/13.14-00752
04/21/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until April 28, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.14-12715
04/29/2014MotionFiled Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.14-13787
04/29/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: May 21, 2014.14-13805
05/22/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Opening Brief which Exceeds Type-Volume Limits.14-16661
05/22/2014MotionFiled Motion for Transmission of Exhibit.14-16662
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 1.14-16663
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 2.14-16664
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 3.14-16665
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 4.14-16666
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 5.14-16667
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 6.14-16672
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 7.14-16673
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 8.14-16677
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 9.14-16678
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 10.14-16679
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 11.14-16687
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 12.14-16688
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 13.14-16691
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 14.14-16692
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 15.14-16694
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 16.14-16696
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 17.14-16697
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 18.14-16698
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 19.14-16699
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 20.14-16700
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 21.14-16706
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 22.14-16707
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 23.14-16708
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 24.14-16709
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 25.14-16710
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 26.14-16713
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 27.14-16714
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 28.14-16715
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 29.14-16716
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 30.14-16717
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 31.14-16718
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 32.14-16719
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 33.14-16720
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 34.14-16721
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 35.14-16722
05/22/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 36.14-16723
05/30/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Original Exhibit. Defense Exhibit G, admitted ay the evidentiary hearing on May 14, 2013, in district court case number C237890-4, due: 30 days.14-17468
05/30/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Opening Brief. We direct the clerk of this court to reject the opening brief received via E-Flex on May 22, 2014. Appellant shall have until June 6, 2014, to file and serve an opening brief that complies with NRAP 32. The opening brief shall not exceed 19,933 words.14-17482
06/04/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-18197
07/07/2014MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief.14-21945
07/15/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: September 5, 2014.14-22872
09/05/2014MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief in Excess of Type Volume Limitations.14-29514
09/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received via E-Flex on September 5, 2014. Appellant: Reply Brief due: 30 days.14-31798
09/24/2014BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.14-31799
10/24/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-35562
10/24/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
09/10/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP15-RP/MD/MC15-27424
10/07/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-30471
10/07/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/20/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 12, 2015.15-30471