Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64623
Short Caption:COYOTE SPRINGS INV., LLC VS. DIST. CT. (BRIGHTSOURCE ENERGY, INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):72273
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A651966Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/13/2014 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/13/2014How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/2013Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from James J. Pisanelli.
12/17/2013Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition Under NRAP 21 and NRAP 27(e) for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus to Prevent the Compelled Disclosure of Attorney-Client Communications During Trial.13-38216
12/17/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.13-38224
12/17/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.13-38228
12/20/2013OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties (Coyote Springs).
12/20/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Declining to Treat Petition as An Emergency, Directing Answer, and Directing Petitioner to Obtain Written, File-Stamped Order. Real party in interest's answer to writ petition: 30 days. Petitioner: 15 days to file any reply. Petitioner: 15 days to obtain district court order.13-38734
01/07/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Filing the District Court's Written, File-Stamped Order. (District Court Order Overruling Plaintiff's Attorney-Client Privilege Objection to Certain Testimony of Harvey Whittemore filed in District Court 1/06/14 Attached).14-00560
01/21/2014Petition/WritFiled BrightSource Energy, Inc.'s Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.14-02057
01/21/2014AppendixFiled Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 1.14-02058
01/21/2014AppendixFiled Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 2.14-02059
01/21/2014AppendixFiled Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 3.14-02060
01/21/2014AppendixFiled Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 4.14-02061
01/21/2014AppendixFiled Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 5.14-02062
02/05/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply to the Answer to the petition due: February 12, 2014.14-03697
02/13/2014Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Emergency Petition Under NRAP 21 and NRAP 27(e) for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus to Prevent the Compelled Disclosure of Attorney-Client Communications During Trial.14-04804
02/13/2014AppendixFiled Petitioner's Reply Appendix Volume 1.14-04805
04/02/2014BriefFiled Real Party in Interest BrightSource Energy, Inc.'s First Notice of Supplemental Authority.14-10512
06/30/2014BriefFiled Real Party in Interest BrightSource Energy, Inc.'s Second Notice of Supplemental Authority.14-21334
07/23/2014BriefFiled Petitioner Coyote Springs Investment, LLC's Response to Brightsource Energy, Inc.'s Supplemental Authorities.14-23902
07/29/2014Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.14-24670
07/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Monday, October 13, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shalle be limited to 30 minutes.14-24875
09/26/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Todd L. Bice of Pisanelli Bice PLLC appearing on behalf of Petitioner, Coyote Springs Investment LLC).14-32132
09/26/2014BriefFiled Petitioner's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.14-32178
09/30/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.14-32453
10/01/2014BriefFiled BrightSource Energy, Inc.'s Response to Petitioner's Notice of Supplemental Authority.14-32589
10/09/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (Pisanelli Bice, PLLC).14-33509
10/13/2014Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP14 - JH/MD/MC.
04/02/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Douglas. 131 Nev. Adv. Op. No. 18. SNP14-JH/MD/MC15-09917
04/27/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-12675
04/27/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. (Letter dated July 21, 2015) Nos. 63284/61059/64623/59638/60527/63076/63683/62792. (Letter entered in 63284 as document no. 15-22234)