Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64694
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF N.M.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - PR 4249Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:01/22/2014 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/13/2015How Submitted:On Record And Briefs
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/27/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
12/27/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal.13-39392
12/27/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-39395
12/31/2013Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Sandra Zamora Gomez. Check No. 602.
12/31/2013Case Status UpdatePilot Program Civil Appeals. Order and documents mailed to proper person appellant. Civil proper person transcript request form due: 15 days. Civil proper person appeal statement due: 40 days.
01/06/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Richard F. Cornell of the Law Offices of Richard F. Cornell for the Appellant.14-00226
01/06/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of Meza Guardianship Updated District Court Docket Entries.14-00229
01/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Referring Appeal to Settlement Program. When this matter was docketed, appellant was proceeding in proper person. Appellant has now filed a "Substitution of Counsel," purporting to substitute attorney Richard F. Cornell "as her counsel of record." As all parties are now represented by counsel, we remove this appeal from the pilot program. Appellant need not complete the Proper Person Appeal Statement or Proper Person Transcript Request Form as previously directed. Finally, counsel for appellant shall file and serve the docketing statement within 15 days of the date of this order.14-01984
01/22/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell.14-02133
01/23/2014MotionFiled Motion for Procedural Orders.14-02395
01/31/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.14-03321
03/11/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant requests that this court "stay all further proceedings in this appeal pending the outcome" of her district court motion for Huneycutt certification. We grant the unopposed motion. This matter is stayed until further order of this court. Appellant: 30 days to file a status report.14-07681
03/27/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report to the Court and Request for Briefing Schedule.14-09788
04/09/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/30/13. To Court Reporter: Zoie Williams.14-11242
04/10/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Updated District Court Docket Entry.14-11429
05/07/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Zoie Williams stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/30/13.14-14730
05/22/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 45 days to file the opening brief and appendix.14-16703
06/05/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Zoie Williams stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/03/13.14-18373
06/25/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.14-20803
06/25/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume I.14-20804
06/25/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume II.14-20805
06/25/2014AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume III.14-20806
07/09/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.14-22226
07/09/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to Allow Respondent to File Answering Brief.14-22263
07/09/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: August 1, 2014.14-22309
07/14/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-22769
07/25/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to Allow Respondent to File Answering Brief.14-24394
08/01/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent: Answering Brief due: August 29, 2014.14-25161
09/02/2014BriefFiled Respondent Graviel Garcia's Answering Brief.14-28789
09/02/2014AppendixFiled Respondent Gravel Garcia's Answering Brief Appendix.14-28793
09/11/2014BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.14-30231
09/12/2014Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/15/2014MotionFiled Motion to Expedite Disposition of Appeal.14-30527
09/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Expedite. This court will expedite the resolution of this appeal to the extent that its docket allows.14-31721
02/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.15-04862
04/29/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP15-NS/MG/KP.15-13012
05/12/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing.15-14490
05/12/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Richard F. Cornell
06/24/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-19316
06/29/2015Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideraton.15-19791
09/24/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition for reconsideration granted; affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 75. EN BANC15-28875
10/19/2015RemittiturIssued Remittitur.15-31730
10/19/2015Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/27/2015RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 20, 2015.15-31730