The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64702
Short Caption:KHOURY VS. SEASTRAND C/W 65007/65172Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Consolidated:64702*, 65007, 65172Related Case(s):65007, 65172
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A636515Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:ParraguirrePanel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre
To SP/Judge:01/06/2014 / Boyer, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/25/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:01/25/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/27/2013Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
12/27/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.13-39455
12/27/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.13-39457
12/27/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.13-39459
12/30/2013Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Steven T Jaffe
12/31/2013Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement due: 20 days.13-39613
01/06/2014Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John Walter Boyer.14-00316
01/15/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.14-01565
01/21/2014Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.14-02038
01/22/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-02257
01/24/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on all Parties and the Settlement Judge.14-02448
01/28/2014Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service of the Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.14-02898
02/06/2014Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.14-03914
02/21/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/11/13, 7/15/13, 7/16/13, 7/17/13, 7/18/13, 7/19/13, 7/22/13, 7/23/13, 7/24/13, 7/25/13, 7/26/13, 12/10/13 & 1/23/14. To Court Reporter: Kristy Clark & Jennifer O'Neill.14-05806
04/01/2014MotionFiled Stipulation and Request to Consolidate Appeals in Case Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-10231
04/08/2014TranscriptFiled Certificate of Acknowledgement from Court Reporter Jennifer O'Neill stating that the requested transcripts were filed in district court. Dates of transcripts: 7/16/13, 7/17/13, 7/19/13, 7/22/13, 7/23/13, 7/25/13, and 7/26/13.14-11205
04/17/2014MotionFiled Reporter's Request for Extension for Preparation of Transcripts (Court Reporter Kristy Clark).14-12448
04/22/2014MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Briefing Schedule. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-12970
05/08/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.14-14827
05/12/2014TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristy Clark stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/15/13, 7/18/13, 7/19/13, 7/22/13, 7/23/13, 7/24/13, 7/25/13, 7/26/13, and 1/23/14. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-15181
05/14/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Motions for Extensions of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 8, 2014. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-15642
07/02/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Continue Deadline to File Appellant's Brief and Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-21602
07/18/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Appellant shall therefore have until August 7, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-23353
08/07/2014MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to file Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-25871
08/18/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 22, 2014. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-27093
09/22/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix - Third Request. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-31401
09/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 6, 2014. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-31711
10/06/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-33109
10/10/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: October 20, 2014. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-33729
10/13/2014MotionFiled Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix and Countermotion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-33806
10/21/2014MotionFiled Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation.14-34941
11/13/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on October 20, 2014. Answering Brief due: 30 days. We deny respondent's countermotion to dismiss this appeal. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37324
11/13/2014BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37325
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Table of Contents to Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37326
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume I. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37327
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume II. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37328
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume III. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37329
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume IV. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37330
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume V. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37331
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume VI. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37332
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume VII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37333
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume VIII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37334
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume IX. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37335
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume X. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37336
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XI. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37337
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37338
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XIII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37339
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XIV. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37340
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XV. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37341
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XVI. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37342
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XVII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37343
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XVIII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37344
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XIX. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37345
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XX. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37346
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XXI. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37347
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XXII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37348
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XXIII. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37349
11/13/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume XXIV. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-37350
12/11/2014MotionFiled Stipulation to Continue Deadline to File Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-40297
12/11/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: January 14, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.14-40366
01/13/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-01357
01/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 13, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-02589
02/13/2015MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief In Excess of Page and Type-Volume Limitations. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-04836
02/13/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172. (EXHIBIT A, PAGES 2-26 AND EXHIBIT C, PAGES 33-41 STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 5/15/15)15-04837
02/18/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on February 13, 2015. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 30 days. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-05321
02/18/2015BriefFiled Answering Brief Respondent's Answering Brief (BRIEF STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 5/15/15)
03/18/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg and Joel Henriod as counsel for the Appellant). Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-08245
03/20/2015MotionFiled Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Appellant to File Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-08596
03/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: April 20, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-08600
04/15/2015MotionFiled Motion to Strike Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-11280
04/20/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-11886
04/24/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike Respondent's Appendix, Or, In The Alternative, Motion to Defer Consideration Pending Respondent's Effort to Enlarge The Record, et al. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-12508
05/01/2015MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-13392
05/15/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has moved to strike two of the three documents included in respondent's appendix. We grant appellant's motion as follows and deny respondent's counter-motion. We grant appellant's motion and strike Exhibit A, pages 2-26, and Exhibit C, pages 33-41 of respondent's appendix. In addition, rather than strike portions of the answering brief that refer to the stricken documents, we strike the entire brief and direct respondent to file an amended answering brief. Respondent: Amended Answering Brief due: 20 days. We deny respondent's request that this court take judicial notice of the stricken documents. We decline to strike portions of the opening brief as requested by respondent. Fn1[Exhibit B, pages 28-32 is file-stamped by the district court; accordingly, it is part of the district court record, and we decline to strike it.] Fn2[We deny as moot appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply.] Nos. 64702/65007/6517215-14938
05/27/2015MotionFiled Motion for Leave to file Answering Brief In Excess of Page and Type-Volume Limitations. Nos. 6470265007/65172.15-16081
05/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page and Type-Volume Limitations. We direct the clerk of this court to file respondent's answering brief and appendix received on May 27, 2015. Reply Brief due: 30 days. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-16317
05/28/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-16319
05/28/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.15-16320
06/30/2015MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-19879
06/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: July 29, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-19957
07/29/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-22916
07/29/2015MotionFiled Amended Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-22942
08/14/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 28, 2015. fn1[Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is denied ass moot.] Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-24610
08/28/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-26213
09/04/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: September 11, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-26931
09/14/2015MotionFiled Motion to Exceed the Type-Volume Limitation for Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-27700
09/23/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's reply brief received via E-Flex on September 11, 2015. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-28790
09/23/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-28791
09/23/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/23/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.15-39515
01/06/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, January 25, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-00307
01/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-00860
01/20/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument (Dan Polsenberg as counsel for Appellant). Nos. 64702/65007/65172.16-01990
01/21/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument, Benjamin P. Cloward, Esq., of Cloward Hicks & Brasier. PLLC will be arguing on behalf respondent Margaret Seastrand at upcoming oral argument. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.16-02055
01/21/2016BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.16-02216
01/22/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.16-02314
01/25/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.
01/25/2016OtherChief Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. Nos. 64702/65007/65172
07/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Pickering, J., concurring. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. EN BANC Nos. 64702/65007/6517216-23415
08/22/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.16-26081
08/22/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 64702/65007/65172.
09/15/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 29, 2016.16-26081
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/69169 (Filed in docket no. 67656 document no. 16-34632)