The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64757
Short Caption:CARROLL (DEANGELO) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Related Case(s):48233, 50576, 50939, 51549, 54272, 55608, 57217, 63115, 67640
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C212667Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/17/2015 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/17/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2014Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/08/2014Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (Filed by District Court Clerk).14-00737
01/09/2014Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on September 8, 2010.14-00883
01/17/2014Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.14-01763
01/31/2014Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.14-03303
02/10/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to Request Transcripts.14-04239
02/12/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Transcript Request due: February 20, 2014.14-04581
02/21/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/07/06; 5/17/07; 5/21/07; 7/26/07; 8/16/07; 8/28/07; 9/20/07; 10/09/07; 10/11/07; 11/29/07; 1/15/08; 1/31/08; 10/23/08; 2/03/09; 5/01/09; 6/11/09; 6/15/09; 6/18/09; 3/30/10; 5/11/10; 5/13/10; 5/17/10; 5/18/10; 5/19/10; 5/20/10; 5/21/10; 5/24/10; 5/25/10; 6/02/10; 6/03/10; 6/04/10; 8/12/10; 12/16/10; 2/17/11; 3/08/11; 3/15/11; 8/30/11; 9/13/11; 11/01/11; 5/10/12; 6/04/12; 6/19/12; 3/26/13; 4/11/13; 8/20/13; 9/17/13; and 10/21/13 (Court Reporter Janie Olsen); 6/27/05; 4/21/06; 8/31/06; and 10/04/06 (Court Reporter Maureen Schorn); 1/22/08 and 1/23/08 (Court Reporter Renee Vincent).14-05761
02/24/2014Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/22/08 & 1/23/08 (Renee Vincent), 2/5/08 (Janie Olsen). To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent & Janie Olsen.14-05912
05/08/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File the Opening Brief (First Request).14-14935
05/15/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 7, 2014. Request for Transcript due: 11 days (if counsel believes necessary).14-15905
07/08/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time (Second Request).14-22044
07/16/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 5, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.14-23062
09/08/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request).14-29542
09/25/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 6, 2014.14-31878
10/07/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request).14-33191
10/10/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 20, 2014.14-33703
10/21/2014MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Fifth Request).14-34915
10/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: October 30, 2014.14-35520
10/29/2014MotionFiled Motion for Order to File Opening Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation (Appellant's Opening Brief is Attached).14-36023
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 1.14-36024
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 2.14-36025
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 3.14-36026
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 4.14-36027
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 5.14-36028
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 6.14-36029
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 7.14-36030
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 8.14-36031
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 9.14-36032
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 10.14-36033
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 11.14-36034
10/29/2014AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume 12.14-36035
11/18/2014MotionFiled Motion for Order Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Original Trial Exhibit 243.14-38034
11/21/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief (not to exceed 19,000 words) due: 30 days.14-38434
11/24/2014Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Transmission of Original Exhibit. District court clerk: 15 days to transmit the original video marked ast State's Exhibit 243.14-38659
12/04/2014BriefFiled Opening Brief Appellant's Opening Brief (Pursuant to the Court's 11/21/2014 Order)14-39429
01/05/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to file Answering Brief.15-00124
01/05/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: February 4, 2015.15-00221
02/03/2015MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Respondent's Answering Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations.15-03573
02/04/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on February 3, 2015. Reply Brief due: 30 days.15-03751
02/04/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-03752
03/06/2015MotionFiled Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Reply Brief (First Request).15-06979
03/06/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief Due: April 6, 2015.15-06987
04/06/2015MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Reply Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. (Brief attached) (DETACHED REPLY BRIEF AND FILED PER ORDER 4/8/15).15-10289
04/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the reply brief attached to the motion filed on April 6, 2015, and file it.15-10608
04/08/2015BriefFiled Reply Brief.15-10609
04/08/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
10/05/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-30063
11/16/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, December 17, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-34951
12/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-36736
12/17/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP15-RP/MD/MC.
04/07/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Parraguirre/Douglas. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 23. SNP15-RP/MD/MC16-10870
04/22/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File a Petition for Rehearing (First Request)16-12747
04/26/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petition for Rehearing due: May 25, 2016.16-13021
05/17/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.16-15322
05/17/2016Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived
06/23/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).16-19691
06/24/2016MotionFiled Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Petition for En Banc Reconsideration (First Request).16-19846
06/28/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: August 8, 2016.16-20154
08/03/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.16-24051
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/64281 (Letter entered in 66816 as document no. 16-24439.)
09/23/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC16-29601
10/21/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Original State's Exhibit 243 to District Court Clerk.16-32998
10/21/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/04/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 27, 2016.16-32998